Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:24-cv-00584
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Order on Motion to Reconsider ~Util - Terminate Case Fri 02/21 8:28 AM
ORDER It is ordered that the motion to withdraw (ECF No.4 ) is construed as a motion for voluntary dismissal. The motion to voluntarily dismiss this action is granted. It is further ordered that the remaining motions (ECF Nos.1 ,3 ) are denied as moot. It is further ordered that this action is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court will close the case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/20/2025. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 motion Motion Reconsider Wed 02/19 12:13 PM
MOTION TO WITHDRAW re1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Joseph Sombrio. (GA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
3 3 motion Motion Appointment of Counsel Wed 01/29 9:44 AM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Joseph Sombrio. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Wed 12/18 9:13 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. ( For Distribution by law library. ) (DLS)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/18 9:11 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Sombrio.(DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint