Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00998

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:24-ap-00142
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Soligent Distribution, LLC
2626 Glenwood Avenue Suite 550
Raleigh, NC 27608
Represented By
Soligent Distribution, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Davis Hartman Wright, PLLC 209 Pollock Street
New Bern, NC 28560
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Buckmiller & Frost, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, March 06, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/06 9:32 AM
Adversary Case 5:24-ap-142 Closed (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/05 9:50 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Soligent Distribution, LLC filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
7 7 order Compromise Mon 03/03 10:13 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, February 06, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Thu 02/06 4:40 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Approve Compromise With Soligent Distribution, LLC
Monday, February 03, 2025
5 5 motion Compromise Mon 02/03 4:19 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Soligent Distribution, LLC filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims (Soligent Distribution, LLC)
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 01/31 9:14 AM
Notice of Settlement filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
3 3 misc Affidavit Thu 01/02 11:03 AM
Affidavit of Service (Summons in an Adversary Proceeding and Complaint) filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 12/18 12:14 AM
Summons Issued on Soligent Distribution, LLC Answer Due 01/17/2025 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/18 12:14 AM
Adversary case 24-00142 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher, III, Chapter 7 Trustee for Covenant Solar Tech, LLC against Soligent Distribution, LLC (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadline (Private) Thu 12/19 7:00 AM
Answer due by 01/17/2025 (adi)
Related: [-]