California Southern District Court
Judge:Janis L Sammartino
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:24-cv-02387
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:0271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 2:15 AM PST
Defendant
Rapidflight Holdings LLC
Represented By
Melenie Van
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Michael David Pegues
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Firestorm Labs, Inc.
Represented By
Eric Rockwell Maas
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Thomas Nathan Millikan
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
18 18 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Fri 03/07 11:59 AM
ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/7/25.(aas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/06 5:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Rapidflight Holdings LLC. (Van, Melenie)
Related: [-]
16 16 respoth Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Thu 03/06 5:22 PM
SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re:15 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Van, Melenie)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Motion to File Documents Under Seal Thu 03/06 5:16 PM
MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Van, Melenie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/27 5:40 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [Redacted] Firestorm Labs, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Firestorm Labs, Inc..(Millikan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Eric Maas
13 13 respoth Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Thu 02/27 5:33 PM
SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re:12 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Millikan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Motion to File Documents Under Seal Thu 02/27 5:30 PM
MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Millikan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/04 2:28 PM
ORDER Granting Defendant's Request for Remote Appearance, re10 Notice filed by Rapidflight Holdings LLC. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/4/25.(aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/03 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Request for Remote Hearing by Rapidflight Holdings LLC (Van, Melenie)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Mon 02/03 1:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Rapidflight Holdings LLC.(Van, Melenie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Declaration
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 01/22 3:10 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Michael D. Pegues, re7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/22/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/22 9:01 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-19527060.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Pegues, Micheal)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/14 2:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rapidflight Holdings LLC, as to Rapidflight Holdings LLC. (Yusa, Miya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/19 4:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of No Infringement against Rapidflight Holdings LLC, filed by Firestorm Labs, Inc.. (Millikan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/18 4:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Firestorm Labs, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Millikan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 12/18 4:29 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (stn)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM Wed 12/18 4:26 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *11,597,490*, *11,840,323* cc:USPTO (stn)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/18 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rapidflight Holdings LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19445260.), filed by Firestorm Labs, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-2387-JLS-JLB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Thomas Millikan)(stn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B