New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Referred: Gabriel W Gorenstein
Case #: 1:24-cv-09763
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 4:29 AM EST
Defendant
Northstar Marketing Group Inc
Defendant
Northstar Source Group LLC
Defendant
Source Digital, Inc.
Plaintiff
Ernest Paniccioli
Represented By
Andrea Terese Timpone
Garson, Segal, Steinmetz, Fladgate LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
35 35 motion Stay Fri 05/09 5:10 PM
LETTER MOTION to Stay Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Matthew Abbott dated May 9, 2025. Document filed by Northstar Marketing Group Inc, Northstar Source Group LLC, Source Digital, Inc...(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 05/05 11:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/5/2025. Defendants to file any motion to stay discovery by May 9, 2025. Opposition due May 13, 2025. Reply due May 15, 2025. If no such motion is filed, the Court will issue the proposed scheduling order with the dates as proposed by plaintiff. (cf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
34 34 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 05/01 5:11 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
33 33 4 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 04/24 12:39 PM
ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: This action is scheduled for an initial case management conference by telephone pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a), on Monday, May 5, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. At that time, the parties shall dial 646-453-4442 and use access code: 199 126 492#. Initial Conference set for 5/5/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/24/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Mon 03/17 11:39 AM
ORDER granting26 Letter Motion to Seal. Application GRANTED. The public right of access to court documents is outweighed by the privacy interests of the parties and others and the interest in preserving the confidentiality of settlement agreements. See United States v. Amodeo, 71 F.3d 1044, 1050 (2d Cir. 1995); In re: Gen. Motors LLC Ignition Switch Litig., No. 14 Misc. 2543, 2016 WL 1317975, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 2, 2016) ("The Second Circuit has repeatedly affirmed the importance of settlement confidentiality in light of the public interest in promoting settlement."). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate ECF No. 26.SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 3/14/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
31 31 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 03/13 7:38 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:23 MOTION to Dismiss , To Strike and Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings . . Document filed by Northstar Source Group LLC, Northstar Marketing Group Inc..(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
30 30 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/06 5:15 PM
DECLARATION of Andrea T. Timpone in Opposition re:23 MOTION to Dismiss , To Strike and Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings .. Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
29 29 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/06 5:05 PM
DECLARATION of Ernest Paniccioli in Opposition re:23 MOTION to Dismiss , To Strike and Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings .. Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Errata B
28 28 11 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/06 5:03 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:23 MOTION to Dismiss , To Strike and Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings . . Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
27 27 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 02/20 11:50 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Matthew Abbott in Support re:23 MOTION to Dismiss , To Strike and Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings .. Document filed by All Parties.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:26 .(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
26 26 motion Seal Thu 02/20 11:45 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Matthew Abbott addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Matthew Abbott dated February 20, 2025. Document filed by Source Digital, Inc...(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 02/20 11:38 PM
DECLARATION of Matthew Abbott in Support re:23 MOTION to Dismiss , To Strike and Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings .. Document filed by Northstar Source Group LLC, Northstar Marketing Group Inc..(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
24 24 27 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 02/20 11:35 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:23 MOTION to Dismiss , To Strike and Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings . . Document filed by Northstar Source Group LLC, Northstar Marketing Group Inc..(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Dismiss Thu 02/20 11:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , To Strike and Alternatively, to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings . Document filed by Northstar Source Group LLC, Northstar Marketing Group Inc..(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 11:26 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Northstar Marketing Group Inc..(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 11:26 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Northstar Source Group LLC..(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 11:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Source Digital, Inc...(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/20 11:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Fontaine Abbott on behalf of Northstar Source Group LLC, Northstar Marketing Group Inc..(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
18 18 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 01/24 11:51 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Defendants may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including February 20, 2025. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendants expressly reserve, any and all defenses. There has been no previous request for extension of time in connection with this matter. So Ordered. Northstar Marketing Group Inc answer due 2/20/2025; Northstar Source Group LLC answer due 2/20/2025; Source Digital, Inc. answer due 2/20/2025. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/24/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
17 17 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 01/23 3:45 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Source Digital, Inc...(Abbott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 01/15 3:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Source Digital, Inc. served on 1/10/2025, answer due 1/31/2025. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent Secretary of State. Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 01/15 3:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Northstar Marketing Group Inc served on 1/10/2025, answer due 1/31/2025. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent Secretary of State. Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 01/15 3:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Northstar Source Group LLC served on 1/9/2025, answer due 1/30/2025. Service was accepted by Robin Hutt-Banks, Registered Agent. Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
13 13 service Summons Issued Mon 01/06 3:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Northstar Source Group LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Mon 01/06 3:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Northstar Marketing Group Inc..(pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 01/06 3:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrea Terese Timpone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Northstar Source Group LLC d/b/a The Source. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 12/31 10:14 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Northstar Source Group LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 12/31 10:13 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NorthStar Marketing Group, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 12/27 4:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Source Digital, Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/26 10:52 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Source Digital, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted Mon 12/23 4:02 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 12/23 4:03 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Andrea Terese Timpone to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name listed on the PDF case caption does not match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 12/20 1:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Northstar Source Group LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Fri 12/20 1:24 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 12/20 11:52 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 12/19/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 12/19 3:28 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 12/19 3:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 12/19 3:29 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 12/19 3:30 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrea Terese Timpone. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 12/19 3:30 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrea Terese Timpone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SOURCE DIGITAL, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient AO 120/121 Form Thu 12/19 3:30 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Andrea Terese Timpone to RE-FILE Document No. 2 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct; do not use the sample form. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/18 8:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney Wed 12/18 8:07 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/18 7:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Northstar Marketing Group Inc, Northstar Source Group LLC d/b/a The Source, SOURCE DIGITAL, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30355472)Document filed by Ernest Paniccioli..(Timpone, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D