Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cv-02318
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Terminated:Dec 31, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 5:51 AM EST
Defendant
General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff
Patent Armory Inc.
Represented By
Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Rabicoff Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
transfer Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer Tue 12/31 4:32 PM
Intradistrict Transfer to Norfolk Division (2:24-cv-739) (ptom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Wed 12/18 8:50 PM
Proposed Summons directed to General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. by Patent Armory Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (other) Wed 12/18 8:48 PM
NOTICE by Patent Armory Inc. of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/18 8:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Patent Armory Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/18 8:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Patent Armory Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/18 8:40 PM
Complaint for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9910764.), filed by Patent Armory Inc..(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 to Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 to Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 to Complaint,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 to Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 to Complaint,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet