Indiana Northern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00188
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2024
Terminated:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 19, 2024 2:20 AM EST
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Emily A Morgan - AUSA
Us Attorney'S Office - Ham/in
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Joseph Johnnell Hannah (1)
Terminated: 12/17/2024
Represented By
Matthew D Soliday - FCD
Federal Community Defenders Inc - Ham/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/19/2024 3:00 AM EST
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5) of Joseph Johnnell Hannah (smb)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 5c3 Documents Received as to Joseph Johnnell Hannah.(nhc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Arrest Warrant
2 2 ORDER/SET HEARING as to Joseph Johnnell Hannah. ZOOM Initial Appearance - Rule 5c3 set for 12/17/2024 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. The Clerk is directed to notify the FCD Office for appointment of counsel. Text entry order.By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/17/2024. (smb)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew D Soliday - FCD appearing for Joseph Johnnell Hannah (Soliday - FCD, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 Defendant's Consent to Appear by Video Teleconference as to Joseph Johnnell Hannah. (smb)
Related: [-]
5 5 INITIAL APPEARANCE - RULE 5(c)(3) as to Joseph Johnnell Hannah held 12/17/2024 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin via video teleconference. Govt appeared by AUSA Emily Morgan. Dft appeared with atty Matthew Soliday. Jerry Navarra appeared on behalf of U S Pretrial Services. Court finds Defend understands the nature and circumstances of alleged offense(s); dft advised of penalties. Dft seeks appointment of counsel in this district only therefore makes no finding of indigence in this District. Dft advises that he will attempt to retain counsel for further proceedings in district of offense. Defend waives identity hearing in this District. Dft released on $20,000 unsecured Appearance Bond with pretrial supervision. Def ORDERED to report to USDC/Western District of Oklahoma, 200 NW 4th Street, Oklahoma City OK Courtroom 201 Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 12/23/2024 @ 3:00 pm. Should dft wish to be appointed counsel on the Western District of Oklahoma, he is to report to the courthouse by noon that day. (#FTR.) (smb)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Rule 5 Hearings by Joseph Johnnell Hannah (smb)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/17/2024. (smb)
Related: [-]
8 8 Appearance Bond Entered as to Joseph Johnnell Hannah in amount of $ 20,000 unsecured, (smb)
Related: [-]
9 9 Notice to Western District of Oklahoma of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Joseph Johnnell Hannah. Your case number is: 5:24-cr-489. Docket sheet and documents attached. (nhc)
Related: [-]
10 10 AMENDED ORDER Setting Conditions of Release with addition that Defendant may travel to Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/17/2024. (smb)
Related: [-]