Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00185
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 19, 2024 2:14 AM EST
defendant
Tyrone Munoz (1)
Represented By
Helen C. Nieuwenhuis
Federal Public Defender (grand Rapids)
contact info
Samuel Roddy
Federal Public Defender (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Raul Robledo (2)
Represented By
Peter Alan VanGelderen
Willey & Chamberlain LLP
contact info
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel T. McGraw
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/19/2024 2:59 AM EST
Thursday, November 21, 2024
WARRANT EXECUTED; defendant Tyrone Munoz arrested by DEA agent Daniel Saldana in Grandville, MI (USM Control Room, mac) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
WARRANT EXECUTED; defendant Raul Robledo arrested by DEA agent Daniel Saldana in Grandville, MI (USM Control Room, mac) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as counsel for defendant Tyrone Munoz, Raul Robledo; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
Federal Public Defender recommends that Peter Alan VanGelderen be appointed to represent defendant Raul Robledo (Federal Public Defender, aw) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
CJA 20 APPOINTMENT of Peter Alan VanGelderen for defendant Raul Robledo (2); signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Tyrone Munoz, Raul Robledo (fhw) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Criminal Complaint
4 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel T. McGraw for USA (fhw) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
5 5 PENALTY SHEET re Complaint1 as to Tyrone Munoz, Raul Robledo (McGraw, Daniel) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SCHEDULING PROGRESSION OF CASE as to defendants Tyrone Munoz, Raul Robledo: preliminary hearing and detention hearing set for 11/25/2024 at 01:00 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTES of FIRST APPEARANCE of defendant Tyrone Munoz (1) held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; defendant's request for court-appointed counsel granted; government request for detention hearing granted; defendant remanded to custody of USM pending further proceedings before the magistrate judge (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 financial affidavit by defendant Tyrone Munoz in support of request for court-appointed counsel [Dona, TX] (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTES of FIRST APPEARANCE of defendant Raul Robledo (2) held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; defendant's request for court-appointed counsel granted; government request for detention hearing granted; defendant remanded to custody of USM pending further proceedings before the magistrate judge (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 financial affidavit by defendant Raul Robledo in support of request for court-appointed counsel [White Cloud] (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
11 11 AMENDED MINUTES of FIRST APPEARANCE7 of defendant Tyrone Munoz (1) held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; defendant's request for court-appointed counsel granted; government request for detention hearing granted; defendant remanded to custody of USM pending further proceedings before the magistrate judge (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 23, 2024
DEFENDANT Tyrone Munoz will be represented by Samuel Roddy (Federal Public Defender, aw) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Helen C. Nieuwenhuis for defendant Tyrone Munoz [Attorney Helen C. Nieuwenhuis added to party Tyrone Munoz(pty:dft)] (Nieuwenhuis, Helen) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
12 12 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Raul Robledo [Access to this document is available to the Court and temporarily available to attorney(s) for USA, Raul Robledo only], USPO Schultz, Benjamin) Modified to revoke attorney access on 11/25/2024 (bjg). [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
13 13 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Tyrone Munoz [Access to this document is available to the Court and temporarily available to attorney(s) for Tyrone Munoz, USA only], USPO Martinez, Natalie) Modified to revoke attorney access on 12/5/2024 (bjg). [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF HEARING as to defendant Tyrone Munoz: detention hearing set for 12/4/2024 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
15 15 MINUTES of PRELIMINARY hearing and DETENTION hearing as to defendant Tyrone Munoz (1) held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, defendant waived preliminary hearing and ordered bound over for further proceedings before the Grand Jury; counsel for defendant requested continuation of detention hearing; detention hearing to be continued at a date and time to be determined (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
16 16 WAIVER of preliminary hearing by defendant Tyrone Munoz (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER that defendant Tyrone Munoz is bound over for further proceedings before the Grand Jury; arraignment and initial pretrial conference if indicted, or status conference, set for 12/20/2024 at 10:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
18 18 MINUTES of PRELIMINARY and DETENTION hearings as to defendant Raul Robledo (2) held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; defendant waived preliminary hearing and ordered bound over for further proceedings before the Grand Jury; defendant heard on detention; defendant released on bond pending further proceedings (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
19 19 WAIVER of preliminary hearing by defendant Raul Robledo (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER that defendant Raul Robledo is bound over for further proceedings before the Grand Jury; arraignment and initial pretrial conference if indicted, or status conference, set for 12/20/2024 at 10:30 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
21 21 BOND and ORDER setting conditions of release as to defendant Raul Robledo on a $10,000 unsecured appearance bond (copy provided to the defendant); signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
22 22 ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Tyrone Munoz; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
23 23 MINUTES of DETENTION hearing as to defendant Tyrone Munoz held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; defendant heard on detention and ordered detained pending further proceedings before the Grand Jury; detention order to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded)(bjg) [1:24-mj-00507-RSK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
24 24 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) INDICTMENT [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Tyrone Munoz, USA, Raul Robledo only] as to Tyrone Munoz, Raul Robledo (mlc)
Related: [-]
25 25 INDICTMENT (REDACTED) as to Tyrone Munoz, Raul Robledo (mlc)
Related: [-]
26 26 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMARY STATEMENT by defendant Tyrone Munoz (Roddy, Samuel)
Related: [-]
27 27 PENALTY SHEET re Indictment25 as to Tyrone Munoz, Raul Robledo (McGraw, Daniel)
Related: [-]
28 28 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMARY STATEMENT by USA as to defendant Tyrone Munoz, Raul Robledo (McGraw, Daniel)
Related: [-]