Rhode Island District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00098
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 19, 2024 2:15 AM EST
Defendant
Edmilson Rodrigues (1)
Represented By
Pamela E. Chin
Lynch & Pine, Attorneys At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ly T. Chin
Doj-Usao
contact info
Peter I. Roklan
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/19/2024 3:00 AM EST
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Edmilson Rodrigues. Initial Appearance set for 12/17/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan.(Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Edmilson Rodrigues. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Initial Appearance as to Edmilson Rodrigues held on 12/17/2024, Detention Hearing as to Edmilson Rodrigues held on 12/17/2024. Ly Chin for the Government, Pamela Chin for the Defendant; Josenny Tavarez for Probation. All parties present. Defendant present. Court informs Deft of his rights; Deft understands; Court appoints CJA(P. Chin) on behalf of Defendant; Court informs Deft of pending charges; Deft waives Preliminary Hearing; Court questions Deft; Court accepts waiver; Court enters Due Process Protections Act Order; Govt argues for detention; Defense argues for release; Argument; Court orders Deft detained; Govt request Status Hearing; Court schedules Status Hearing for 1/3/2025 at 10AM; Deft remanded; recess. (Court Reporter FTR in Courtroom B at 3:43PM) (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Edmilson Rodrigues. Status Conference set for 1/3/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Edmilson Rodrigues (1).(Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING CJA PANEL ATTORNEY as to Edmilson Rodrigues: the Panel Attorney appointed as CJA Counsel is Pamela E. Chin for Edmilson Rodrigues. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/17/2024. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Edmilson Rodrigues. Accepted by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER PURSUANT TO DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Edmilson Rodrigues. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/17/2024. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Edmilson Rodrigues. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/17/2024. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]