New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Rochon
Case #: 1:24-cv-09772
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Terminated:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
Coty DTC Holdings, LLC
350 5th Avenue 19th Floor
New York, NY 10118
Plaintiff
Sylinia Jackson
On Behalf of Herself and All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates 150 E 18th Street Suite PHR
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Dana Lauren Gottlieb
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/05 11:30 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised at Dkt. 20 that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by June 19, 2025; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(C) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are cancelled. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 6/19/2025.) (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 5/5/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 05/02 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Sylinia Jackson..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 04/17 10:52 AM
ORDER terminating18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File ; terminating18 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File ; granting19 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The requested adjournment is granted. The initial pretrial conference is rescheduled to May 13, 2025 at 10:30 a.m., and the parties shall submit their joint letter by May 3, 2025. The Clerk of Court is also respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. 18, which appears to be duplicative of the Court's order scheduling the initial pretrial conference, see Dkt. 16, and does not request any action by the Court. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 4/17/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Document Adjourn Conference Wed 04/16 11:46 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Dana L. Gottlieb, Esq. dated April 16, 2025., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Dana L. Gottlieb, Esq. dated April 16, 2025. Document filed by Sylinia Jackson..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Document Adjourn Conference Wed 04/16 11:43 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Dana L. Gotlieb, Esq. dated April 16, 2025., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Dana L. Gotlieb, Esq. dated April 16, 2025. Document filed by Sylinia Jackson..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
17 17 service Certificate of Service Other Fri 03/28 2:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judge Rochon's Order Dated 3/28/25 and Her Honor's Individual Rules served on Coty DTC Holdings, LLC on March 28, 2025. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Sylinia Jackson..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
16 16 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 03/24 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/29/2025 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 3/24/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Fri 03/21 5:16 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Sean J. Kirby and Jeffrey Gottlieb dated March 21, 2025 re: Status. Document filed by Coty DTC Holdings, LLC..(Kirby, Sean)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/21 1:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Coty DTC Holdings, LLC..(Kirby, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
13 13 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/17 12:34 PM
ORDER. Pursuant to the Court's order at Dkt. 7, the parties' joint letter was due on March 15, 2021. That date has passed without the parties filing their joint letter or otherwise communicating with the Court. As a courtesy, the Court will extend the deadline to file a joint letter addressing the issues set forth in Dkt. 7 to March 21, 2025. (Status Report due by 3/21/2025). (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/24 4:39 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The requested extension is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be March 21, 2025. SO ORDERED. Coty DTC Holdings, LLC answer due 3/21/2025. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 2/24/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/24 1:41 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Sean J. Kirby dated February 24, 2025. Document filed by Coty DTC Holdings, LLC..(Kirby, Sean)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean Joseph Kirby on behalf of Coty DTC Holdings, LLC..(Kirby, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 order Order Thu 02/20 10:36 AM
ORDER. The docket reflects that Defendant was served on January 29, 2025. Dkt. 8. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint was February 19, 2025. That date has now passed without Defendant filing an answer or otherwise communicating with the Court. As a courtesy, the Court will extend the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 27, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (dih)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 02/03 1:40 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Coty DTC Holdings, LLC served on 1/29/2025, answer due 2/19/2025. Service was accepted by Registred Agent. Document filed by Sylinia Jackson..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/22 5:35 PM
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. In their discussions, the parties should consider whether plaintiff has satisfied the threshold requirement of standing. See, e.g., Calcano v. Swarovski N. Am. Ltd., 36 F.4th 68, 77-78 (2d Cir. 2022); Harty v. W. Point Realty, Inc., 28 F.4th 435, 443-44 (2d Cir. 2022). To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter informing the Court whether the parties have settled. If the parties do not reach a settlement, the parties shall in the joint letter request that the Court (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge for a settlement conference (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) proceed with an initial status conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 1/22/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 12/20 10:18 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Coty DTC Holdings, LLC. (sj)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/20 10:17 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/20 10:10 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Dana Lauren Gottlieb. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 12/20 10:13 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 12/20 10:14 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 12/20 10:15 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/19 1:25 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Sylinia Jackson..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/19 12:50 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/19 12:50 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Coty DTC Holdings, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Sylinia Jackson..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/19 12:49 AM
COMPLAINT against Coty DTC Holdings, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30356330)Document filed by Sylinia Jackson..(Gottlieb, Dana)
Related: [-]