Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Case #: 1:24-cv-02209
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
U.S. Internal Revenue Service
Defendant
United States of America
950 Pennsylvania Ave.
Washington, DC 20530
Plaintiff
First Source Employee Management, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph G. Corsaro
Corsaro & Associates
contact info
Christian M. Bates
Corsaro Law
contact info
Steven B. Beranek
Corsaro & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Mon 05/05 2:11 PM
Motion to dismiss filed by U.S. Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. Related document(s)1 .(Hall, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
12 12 motion Extension (answer complaint) Wed 03/26 9:11 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until May 5, 2025 to answer filed by U.S. Internal Revenue Service, United States of America.(Glen, Julia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Wed 03/26 9:26 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants'12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. U.S. Internal Revenue Service and United States of America answer due 5/5/2025. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 3/26/2025.(S,SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
11 11 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Fri 03/21 7:53 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by Certified Mail executed upon Internal Revenue Service on February 10, 2025 filed on behalf of First Source Employee Management, Inc. (Bates, Christian)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Fri 03/21 7:51 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by Certified Mail executed upon United States of America on 2/4/2025 filed on behalf of First Source Employee Management, Inc. (Bates, Christian)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Fri 03/21 7:47 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by Certified Mail executed upon United States of America on February 10, 2025 filed on behalf of First Source Employee Management, Inc. (Bates, Christian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Tue 03/11 9:54 AM
Notice of Service of Complaint filed by First Source Employee Management, Inc.. (Bates, Christian)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Tue 03/11 9:53 AM
Notice of Service of Complaint on USA filed by First Source Employee Management, Inc.. (Bates, Christian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
6 6 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 01/29 11:42 AM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon U.S. Internal Revenue Service. (M,CE)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_doc Praecipe Wed 01/29 10:17 AM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by First Source Employee Management, Inc.. Related document(s)4 . (Bates, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
4 4 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Fri 01/24 10:36 AM
Supplement to Complaint, - Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)1 . (Bates, Christian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 01/21 3:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bates, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Failure to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/20 11:48 AM
Notice by Clerk that First Source Employee Management, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Thu 12/19 11:39 AM
Original Summonses and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States of America c/o Merrick Garland, US Attorney General and c/o Rebecca C. Lutzko, U.S. Attorney for Northern District of Ohio.. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/19 10:26 AM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12880512. Filed by First Source Employee Management Inc. (Bates, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons-USA-Gar,
Att: 3 Summons-USA-Lut
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 12/19 11:05 AM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 12/19 11:06 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]