Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Case #: 0:24-cv-62386
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 3:52 AM EST
Defendant
Valentine & Kebartas, LLC
15 Union St
Lawrence, MA 01840
Plaintiff
Vivian Collins
Represented By
Cortney Elizabeth Walters
The Law Office Of Cortney E Walters, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 02/24 3:59 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Fri 02/21 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vivian Collins (Walters, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
5 5 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Fri 12/20 1:45 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses). Motions for Extension of Time Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Labeling Exhibits on CM/ECF Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Court's CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Notices of Settlement Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/20/2024. (nni)
Related: [-]
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 12/20 1:44 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/20/2024. (nni)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 12/19 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Valentine & Kebartas, LLC. (jas)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 12/19 11:07 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/19 9:31 AM
COMPLAINT against Valentine & Kebartas, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18064715, filed by Vivian Collins.(Walters, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)