New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: Lee G Dunst
Case #: 2:24-cv-08656
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Terminated:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
Dadi360 Inc.
Represented By
Arvind Jayakumar
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Miller Photographer, LLC
Represented By
Craig B. Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Report on Copyright AO121 Thu 02/06 12:35 PM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (LH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Electronic entry terminating civil case
Thursday, January 30, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/30 12:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary) by Robert Miller Photographer, LLC (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 01/30 2:59 PM
Civil Case Terminated. See voluntary dismissal, doc #9. (FG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
order Scheduling Order Wed 01/22 4:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold an Initial Conference on 3/14/2025 at 11:30AM in Courtroom 830 of the Alfonse M. D'Amato Federal Courthouse, Central Islip. The parties are directed to follow Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rules, which are available on the Court's website, and submit a proposed discovery plan/scheduling order at least five business days prior to the initial conference pursuant to Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rule IV.A.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 1/22/2025. (CT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Arvind Jayakumar on behalf of Dadi360 Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Jayakumar, Arvind)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/17 10:47 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Dadi360 Inc.. (Jayakumar, Arvind)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/03 2:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Miller Photographer, LLC. Dadi360 Inc. served on 1/3/2025, answer due 1/24/2025. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 12/19 12:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Dadi360 Inc.. (SMF)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Report on Copyright AO121 Thu 12/19 12:23 PM
Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 12/19 12:01 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SMF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 12/19 11:52 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (SMF)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/19 11:21 AM
COMPLAINT against Dadi360 Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18598881, filed by Robert Miller Photographer, LLC. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photograph,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons,
Att: 5 Supplement AO 121 Form,
Att: 6 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/19 12:01 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF)
Related: [-]