Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brad Wesley Odell
Case #: 1:24-bk-10224
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Dismissed:Apr 03, 2025
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025

Debtor
Callahan County Farmers Cooperative, Inc.
200 E 1st St
Baird, TX 79504-6413
Represented By
Max Ralph Tarbox
Tarbox Law, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 12/19/2024 12:05 PM CST
Thursday, December 19, 2024
crditcrd none Thu 12/19 11:48 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 7)([LINK 24-10224 7] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt number A32076373, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer) Thu 12/19 11:43 AM
Non-individual Chapter 7 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Callahan County Farmers Cooperative, Inc. (Tarbox, Max)
Related: [-]