New Jersey District Court
Judge:Evelyn Padin
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:24-cv-11312
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseMotion to Compel
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Case in other court:U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada, BK-S-22-14422-NMC
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 4:19 AM EST
Movant
RYAN DREXLER
Represented By
DANIEL Z. GOLDMAN
Bienert Katzman Littrell Willaims LLP
contact info
Respondent
PRESTIGE CAPITAL FINANCE, LLC


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Quash Wed 01/29 3:24 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER withdrawing1 Movant Drexler's Motion to Compel Non-Party Prestige Capital Finance, LLC to Produce Documents Responsive to Subpoena ; dismissing this action without prejudice as to Respondent Prestige Capital Finance, LLC. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 1/29/2025. (dam)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/29 3:25 PM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to8 Notice and Order. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Tue 01/28 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and Withdrawal of Motion to Compel by RYAN DREXLER (GOLDMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Status Report Tue 01/28 2:03 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding February 3, 2025 Hearing on Drexler's Emergency Motion to Compel Documents Responsive to Subpoena by RYAN DREXLER. (GOLDMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
5 5 order Stipulation and Order Fri 01/17 3:05 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER adjourning1 Emergency Motion to Compel Non-Party Prestige Capital Finance, LLC to Produce Documents Responsive to Subpoena. The Motion's return date shall be adjourned to 2/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/17/2025. (dam)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Status Report Fri 01/17 2:25 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding January 21, 2025 Hearing on Drexler's Emergency Motion to Compel Documents Responsive to Subpoena by RYAN DREXLER. (GOLDMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/17 3:07 PM
Reset Deadlines as to1 Emergency Motion to Compel Non-Party Prestige Capital Finance, LLC to Produce Documents Responsive to Subpoena. Motion reset for 2/3/2025 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
3 3 misc Stipulation Thu 01/16 9:46 PM
STIPULATION Adjourning Return Date by PRESTIGE CAPITAL FINANCE, LLC. (ROLDAN, VINCENT)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
2 2 order Order Fri 12/20 3:14 PM
TEXT ORDER: Movant Ryan Drexler has filed an "emergency motion" to compel non-party Prestige Capital Finance, LLC to produce documents responsive to a subpoena issued in connection with a bankruptcy proceeding pending in the District of Nevada. (ECF No. 1). After careful consideration of the docket for this matter and the underlying bankruptcy litigation, and given the timing of the subpoena in question and the date that the January 24, 2025 bankruptcy proceeding was scheduled, Movant has not demonstrated good cause for resolving his motion to compel on an expedited basis. The Court will address that application in the ordinary course. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/20/24. (tjd)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/20 10:21 AM
Set Deadlines as to1 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas. Motion set for 1/21/2025 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, ) Modified on 12/20/2024 (adc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
1 1 motion Motion to Quash/Compel/Enforce Thu 12/19 12:42 PM
MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Subpoenas ( Filing fee $ 52 receipt number ANJDC-15890304.), filed by RYAN DREXLER.(GOLDMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Ryan Drexler's Emergency Motion to Compel Non-Party Prestige Capital Finance, LLC to Produce Documents Responsive to Subpoena,
Att: 2 Declaration of Anthony R. Bisconti,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/19 5:51 PM
Case assigned to Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
Related: [-]