Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-19307

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Christine M Gravelle
Case #: 3:24-ap-01653
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Najam Qureshi
84 Garden Avenue
Franklin Park, NJ 08823
Represented By
Najam Qureshi
contact info
Plaintiff
Gul Muhammad and Sobia Chaudry
12 Blossom Hill Drive
Plainsboro, NJ 08536
Represented By
Aiden Murphy
Scura, Wigfield, Heyer, Stevens & Cammarota LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 03/06 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 03/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 03/06 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
9 9 misc Mediator's Acceptance of Appointment Tue 03/04 1:41 PM
Mediator's Acceptance of Appointment Related [+] filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Anthony Sodono, III, Esq. (Mediator). (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-] 8 Mediation Order
court Hearing Held Tue 03/04 11:30 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Amended Summons Issued Related [+] (mjb)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Summons Issued to Gul Muhammad and Sobia Chaudry for Service on Huma Qureshi Answer due on 1/21/2025; Najam Qureshi Answer due on 1/21/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/4/2025 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton.
court Hearing Held Tue 03/04 11:37 AM
Amended Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Joint Scheduling Order and Mediation Order Submitted Related [+] (mjb)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Summons Issued to Gul Muhammad and Sobia Chaudry for Service on Huma Qureshi Answer due on 1/21/2025; Najam Qureshi Answer due on 1/21/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/4/2025 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton.
court Hearing Held Tue 03/04 2:38 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Amended Summons Issued Related [+] (mjb)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Gul Muhammad and Sobia Chaudry for Service on Najam Qureshi Answer due on 1/21/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/4/2025 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attachments) (wdr)
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 order Mediation Order Mon 03/03 10:56 AM
Mediation Order. Anthony Sodono, III, Esq. (Mediator) added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/3/2025 (mjb)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Joint Scheduling Order Mon 03/03 10:53 AM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/3/2025 Discovery due by 6/2/2025. Trial date set for 9/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/27 8:03 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of Huma Qureshi, Najam Qureshi. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants Najam and Huma Qureshi to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 01/29 6:01 PM
Stipulation Between Huma Qureshi, Najam Qureshi and Plaintiffs Gul Muhammad and Sobia Chaudhry and Defendants Najam and Huma Qureshi, re:Extension of Time for Defendants Najam and Huma Qureshi to Answer or Otherwise Respon Related [+] filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of Huma Qureshi, Najam Qureshi. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/31 9:48 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Aiden Murphy on behalf of Sobia Chaudry, Gul Muhammad. (Murphy, Aiden)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01653 Complaint by Gul Muhammad and Sobia Chaudry against Najam Qureshi. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C),3 Amended Summons Issued to Gul Muhammad and Sobia Chaudry for Service on Huma Qureshi Answer due on 1/21/2025; Najam Qureshi Answer due on 1/21/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/4/2025 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (llb)
Friday, December 20, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 12/20 9:21 AM
Amended Summons Issued to Gul Muhammad and Sobia Chaudry for Service on Huma Qureshi Answer due on 1/21/2025; Najam Qureshi Answer due on 1/21/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/4/2025 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 12/19 4:02 PM
Summons Issued to Gul Muhammad and Sobia Chaudry for Service on Najam Qureshi Answer due on 1/21/2025 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/4/2025 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (wdr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachments
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/18 3:38 PM
Adversary case 24-01653 Complaint by Gul Muhammad and Sobia Chaudry against Najam Qureshi. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Murphy, Aiden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C