Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Case #: 1:24-cv-02220
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
City of Rocky River
21012 Hilliard Drive
Rocky River, OH 44116
Represented By
Hunter C. Cyran
Jackson Lewis - Cleveland
contact info
Vincent J. Tersigni
Jackson Lewis - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
George Lichman
Individually and in his officicial Capacity as Chief of Police of the City of Rocky River 21012 HIlliard Drive
Rocky River, OH 44116
Represented By
Hunter C. Cyran
Jackson Lewis - Cleveland
contact info
Vincent J. Tersigni
Jackson Lewis - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Greg King
22400 Sandy Lane
Fairview Park, OH 44139
Represented By
Mark P. Herron
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 minutes Case Management Conference Tue 04/01 10:41 AM
Minutes/Case Management Plan: A Case Management Conference was held by telephone on March 31, 2025 at 1:00 PM. Present on the call were Mark Herron for Plaintiff and Vincent Tersigni for Defendants. Case is placed upon the standard track. The parties shall be prepared to discuss their amenability to mediation with the assigned magistrate judge at the next telephone status conference, which is set for November 4, 2025 at 10:00 AM. See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 4/1/2025. (Court Reporter: none.) Time: 8 minutes. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Mon 03/31 3:04 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Greg King. (Herron, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 03/25 10:11 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant City of Rocky River filed by Greg King. (Herron, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
9 9 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 03/13 10:36 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Rule 26(F) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by City of Rocky River, George Lichman. (Tersigni, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
8 8 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 02/11 2:52 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with telephonic case management conference to be held on 3/31/2025 at 01:00 PM. Counsel will receive, via email, instructions on accessing the call prior to the conference. See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 2/11/2025. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Thursday, February 06, 2025
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Thu 02/06 2:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by City of Rocky River. (Tersigni, Vincent)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/06 2:06 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by City of Rocky River, George Lichman. (Tersigni, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Wed 01/15 11:39 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants'5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer. City of Rocky River and George Lichman answer due 2/6/2025. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 1/15/2025.(S,SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
5 5 2 pgs motion Extension (answer complaint) Tue 01/14 12:59 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 6, 2025 to answer filed by City of Rocky River, George Lichman. Related document(s)1 . (Tersigni, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
4 4 3 pgs service Return of Service Executed Mon 12/30 3:47 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon George Lichman on 12/26/2024, filed on behalf of Greg King (Herron, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs service Return of Service Executed Mon 12/30 3:42 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon City of Rocky River on 12/26/2024, filed on behalf of Greg King (Herron, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
2 2 4 pgs oth_evt Summons Issued Thu 12/19 2:08 PM
Original Summonses and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon City of Rocky River, George Lichman.. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/19 1:46 PM
Complaint and jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12881538. Filed by Greg King. (Herron, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons - City of Rocky River,
Att: 3 2 pgs Summons - Lichman
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 12/19 2:05 PM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 12/19 2:06 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]