California Northern District Court
Judge:Noel Wise
Case #: 5:24-cv-09224
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 12:57 AM PST
Defendant
FTI Consulting LLP
Represented By
Sheila Anil Gogate Armbrust
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Lu
2361 Brandini Dr.
Dublin, CA 94568
Plaintiff
Xin Wang
14890 Montavlo Rd.
Saratoga, CA 95070


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
49 49 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 04/21 3:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING 47 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings signed by Judge Noel Wise on 4/21/2025. Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2025 at 09:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (akw, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
48 48 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 04/21 10:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FTI Consulting LLP re47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
47 47 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/18 3:57 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings filed by FTI Consulting LLP. (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
46 46 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 04/01 11:09 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FTI Consulting LLP re44 Joint Case Management Statement (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
45 45 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 03/31 4:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FTI Consulting LLP re42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings; Memorandum and Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ,43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Four Exhibits (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
44 44 misc Joint Case Management Statement Mon 03/31 3:04 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by FTI Consulting LLP. (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
43 43 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mon 03/31 11:52 AM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Four Exhibits filed by FTI Consulting LLP.(Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jamie Kase in Support of Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Certain Portions of Four Exhibits Under Seal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Christopher Y. Lee Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 in Support of Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Certain Portions of Four Exhibits Under Seal,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Certain Portions of Four Exhibits Under Seal,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 (sealed),
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 (sealed),
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 (sealed),
Att: 7 Exhibit 12 (sealed)
42 42 motion Stay Mon 03/31 11:26 AM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings; Memorandum and Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by FTI Consulting LLP. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2025 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before District Judge Noel Wise. Responses due by 4/14/2025. Replies due by 4/21/2025.(Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher Y. Lee in Support of Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 (redacted),
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 (redacted),
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 (redacted),
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 (redacted),
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Declaration of Rachel Brown in Support of Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings,
Att: 16 Exhibit 1,
Att: 17 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings
Friday, March 14, 2025
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 03/14 4:56 PM
ORDER by Judge Noel Wise denying 35 Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Respond; finding as moot 38 Motion for Leave to File. (nwlc3, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
40 40 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 03/03 2:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FTI Consulting LLP re38 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Its Pending Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Respond (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
39 39 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 02/28 7:31 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byXin Wang, Kevin Lu. (Wang, Xin)
Related: [-] 38 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Its Pending Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Respond
38 38 motion Leave to File Document Fri 02/28 5:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Its Pending Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Respond filed by FTI Consulting LLP.(Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant FTI Consulting LLP's Motion for Leave to File Reply
Thursday, February 27, 2025
37 37 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 02/27 7:59 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byXin Wang, Kevin Lu.(Wang, Xin)
Related: [-] 35 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend FTI Consulting LLP's Deadline to Respond to the Amended Complaint and the Deadline to Submit a Case Management Statement
Att: 1 Declaration Kevin Lu's Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit email 02.25.2025,
Att: 3 Exhibit email 02.26.2025
36 36 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 02/27 12:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FTI Consulting LLP re35 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend FTI Consulting LLP's Deadline to Respond to the Amended Complaint and the Deadline to Submit a Case Management Statement (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Thu 02/27 10:39 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend FTI Consulting LLP's Deadline to Respond to the Amended Complaint and the Deadline to Submit a Case Management Statement filed by FTI Consulting LLP. Responses due by 3/3/2025.(Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher Y. Lee in Support of Defendant FTI Consulting's Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Respond,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting FTI Consulting LLP's Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Respond
Monday, February 24, 2025
34 34 oth_evt Clerks Notice ADI Mon 02/24 7:13 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Noël Wise in the San Jose Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials NW immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED . However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Wise by the moving party for a date consistent with the Court?s law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoffs remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after May 27, 2025 , and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before May 27, 2025 are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines ( eg. , motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. On or before March 17, 2025 , the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlines in the [LINK:Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District.] the approved form for such statements can be accessed [LINK:here] : a. The parties are not required to complete a section if inapplicable. As number 20, the statement shall provide the following information: (i) a list or description of each party; (ii) a summary of all claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third party claims and the date the complaint and cross-complaint(s) were filed; and (iii) a brief procedural history of the case (chart format welcomed) including, but not limited to, any ADR proceedings or settlement conferences that have been scheduled or concluded and any appellate proceedings that are pending or concluded. b. If the parties believe that an immediate case management conference is needed, the parties shall explain why and identify the urgent matters that require attention. If there is no immediate need, a case management conference will be scheduled or reset pursuant to Paragraph 2 of this Order as needed. 9. The Joint Case Management Statement will not constitute a motion to extend or modify dates. If emergency relief is needed to modify a deadline, and the deadline is not of the type that can be modified via stipulation of the parties without a court order, the requesting party or parties shall additionally file a motion or stipulation for such relief in compliance with Local Rule 6. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 02/24/2025 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (kab-adi, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/24 1:37 PM
This case is directly assigned to District Judge Noel Wise. Judge Eumi K Lee no longer assigned to the case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
33 33 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 02/19 5:06 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. FTI Consulting's22 Motion to Dismiss and26 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal are terminated as moot in light of the32 Amended Complaint. The30 Exhibits provisionally filed under seal will remain sealed, as the Court has not considered them. The motion hearing set for 5/14/25 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
32 32 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/19 4:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against FTI Consulting LLP. Filed by Xin Wang, Kevin Lu. (Wang, Xin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
31 31 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 02/10 4:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FTI Consulting LLP re29 Proposed Order,24 Declaration in Support,22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ,23 Declaration in Support,30 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,26 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Three Exhibits , 17 Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney,25 Proposed Order,21 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice,28 Declaration in Support, 16 Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney,20 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice,27 Declaration in Support Administrative Motion to File Certain Portions of Three Exhibits Under Seal (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
30 30 oth_sup Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fri 02/07 7:52 PM
EXHIBITS re26 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Three Exhibits filed byFTI Consulting LLP. Related [+] (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-] 26
Att: 1 Exhibit 3 (sealed),
Att: 2 Exhibit 4 (sealed),
Att: 3 Exhibit 5 (sealed)
29 29 misc Proposed Order Fri 02/07 7:38 PM
Proposed Order re26 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Three Exhibits by FTI Consulting LLP. (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
28 28 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 02/07 7:35 PM
Declaration of Christopher Y. Lee in Support of26 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Three Exhibits filed byFTI Consulting LLP. Related [+] (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-] 26
27 27 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 02/07 7:34 PM
Declaration of Jamie Kase in Support of26 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Three Exhibits filed byFTI Consulting LLP. Related [+] (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-] 26
26 26 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fri 02/07 7:22 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Three Exhibits filed by FTI Consulting LLP. (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Proposed Order Fri 02/07 5:43 PM
Proposed Order re22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by FTI Consulting LLP. (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
24 24 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 02/07 5:41 PM
Declaration of Richard Edwards in Support of22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFTI Consulting LLP. Related [+] (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-] 22
23 23 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 02/07 5:39 PM
Declaration of Sarah A. Hemmendinger in Support of22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFTI Consulting LLP. Related [+] (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-] 22
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (redacted),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (redacted),
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 (redacted),
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
22 22 motion Dismiss Fri 02/07 5:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by FTI Consulting LLP. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/14/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Responses due by 2/21/2025. Replies due by 2/28/2025. (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 1:54 PM
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gina R. Bohannon. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee (lrt, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 1:53 PM
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Y. Lee. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee (lrt, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 12:56 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20326087.) filed by FTI Consulting LLP. (Bohannon, Gina)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 12:50 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20325993.) filed by FTI Consulting LLP. (Lee, Christopher)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 02/07 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Daniel David Rubinstein on behalf of FTI Consulting LLP (Rubinstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 02/07 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Sarah Alison Hemmendinger on behalf of FTI Consulting LLP (Hemmendinger, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
15 15 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 01/31 1:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FTI Consulting LLP re 9 ,10 ,11 , 12 ,13 , 14 (Armbrust, Sheila) Modified on 1/31/2025 linking entry to associated documents (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 01/31 11:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Eumi K. Lee. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting. Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at eklcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 5, 2025 at 5:00PM PT. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/31 8:32 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Eumi K Lee for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes.(smc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 01/31 2:16 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:15 Certificate of Service filed by FTI Consulting LLP (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 01/30 5:36 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 01/30 2:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FTI Consulting LLP.. (Armbrust, Sheila)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 01/30 2:27 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by FTI Consulting LLP identifying Corporate Parent FTI Consulting, Inc. for FTI Consulting LLP. (Armbrust, Sheila)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 01/30 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Sheila Anil Gogate Armbrust on behalf of FTI Consulting LLP (Armbrust, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
utility Remark Mon 01/27 12:11 PM
Summons and Complaint delivered to Post Office as requested in letter (document #8) from Xin Wang. Plaintiff notified via email on 1/14/2025. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
8 8 misc Letter Tue 01/07 11:41 PM
Letter from Xin Wang, requesting foreign mailing to Defendant FTI Consulting LLP .(Wang, Xin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit FedEx shipping label
Monday, January 06, 2025
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 01/06 12:13 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Lu.. (Wang, Xin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 01/06 12:12 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Xin Wang.. (Wang, Xin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 12/30 12:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Plaintiffs are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2025. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 12/20 11:25 AM
Summons Issued as to FTI Consulting LLP. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 12/19 3:27 PM
Proposed Summons. (Wang, Xin)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 12/19 2:28 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/19 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT against FTI Consulting LLP (Filing fee $ 405. Receipt # 511019325). Filed by Xin Wang, Kevin Lu. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2025.(dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt