Arizona District Court
Judge:John J Tuchi
Case #: 2:24-cv-03631
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause26:7426 IRS: Wrongful Levy for Taxes
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 1:40 AM MST
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
Represented By
Michael R Pahl
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Christopher Rajotte
Us Dept Of Justice - Tax Division
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Treasury
Represented By
Michael R Pahl
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Christopher Rajotte
Us Dept Of Justice - Tax Division
contact info
Defendant
United States Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
Michael R Pahl
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Christopher Rajotte
Us Dept Of Justice - Tax Division
contact info
Plaintiff
RMP Residential 1 LLC
Represented By
Aaron M Finter
Schern Richardson Finter Decker PLC
contact info
Michael Robert Somers
Schern Richardson Finter PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/21 2:58 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by United States of America. (Rajotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/14 3:11 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by RMP Residential 1 LLC. (Somers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
29 29 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 05/09 9:24 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by United States of America.(Rajotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, April 25, 2025
28 28 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/25 10:35 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by RMP Residential 1 LLC.(Somers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 04/21 2:12 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc.24 ). Plaintiff shall file and serve its Second Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc.23 ). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/21/2025. (KJ)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/21 8:41 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:24 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by United States of America. (Rajotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
25 25 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/09 9:58 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) filed by RMP Residential 1 LLC. (Somers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
24 24 motion Leave to File Document Mon 04/07 4:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by RMP Residential 1 LLC.(Somers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
23 23 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 03/26 5:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) by United States of America. (Rajotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases Tue 03/25 4:41 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re: (20 in 2:24-cv-03630-SHD, 20 in 2:24-cv-03630-SHD) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and MOTION to Transfer Related Case filed by United States of America, United States of America. (Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-03630-SHD, 2:24-cv-03631-JJT) (Rajotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
21 21 misc Withdrawal of Document Wed 03/19 7:13 PM
WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re:18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant United States of America. (Rajotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
20 20 respm Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases Tue 03/18 4:28 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re: (20 in 2:24-cv-03630-SHD, 20 in 2:24-cv-03630-SHD, 20 in 2:24-cv-03630-SHD) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and MOTION to Transfer Related Case filed by RMP Residential 1 LLC. (Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-03631-JJT, 2:24-cv-03630-SHD) (Somers, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases Tue 03/18 4:22 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re: (20 in 2:24-cv-03630-SHD, 20 in 2:24-cv-03630-SHD, 20 in 2:24-cv-03630-SHD) MOTION to Consolidate Cases and MOTION to Transfer Related Case filed by Green Home Rentals LLC, Arbors Unlimited LLC. (Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-03630-SHD, 2:24-cv-03631-JJT) (Somers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time Mon 03/10 3:55 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by United States of America.(Rajotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
17 17 motion Consolidate Cases Transfer Related Case Wed 03/05 12:08 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases and , MOTION to Transfer Related Case by United States of America, United States of America. (Associated Cases: CV 24-3630 PHX-SHD, CV 24-3631 PHX-JTT) (Rajotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Arizona Entity Registrations,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, February 28, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) Fri 02/28 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by RMP Residential 1 LLC . (Somers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Thu 02/27 2:50 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:14 Amended Complaint filed by RMP Residential 1 LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/26 2:50 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by RMP Residential 1 LLC.(Somers, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/11 9:42 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Motion for Enlargement of Time (Unopposed) (First Request) (Doc.12 ). Defendant United States has until March 26, 2025, to file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc.1 ). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/11/2025. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/07 7:30 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Department of Justice.(Rajotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Fri 01/24 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Rajotte on behalf of United States Department of Justice. (Rajotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Wed 01/22 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Pahl on behalf of United States Department of Justice. (Pahl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 12/20 9:45 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on March 19, 2025. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/19/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Fri 12/20 9:26 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/19/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
7 7 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Thu 12/19 5:02 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint by Plaintiff RMP Residential 1 LLC. (Finter, Aaron)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by RMP Residential 1 LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Complaint. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 12/19 3:45 PM
Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
4 4 misc New Case Opened Thu 12/19 3:43 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23793457. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-03631 PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Submitted Thu 12/19 3:42 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by RMP Residential 1 LLC. (submitted by Michael Somers)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 12/19 3:41 PM
Disclosure Statement by RMP Residential 1 LLC. (submitted by Michael Somers) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/19 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23793457 filed by RMP Residential 1 LLC. (submitted by Michael Somers)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Thu 12/19 3:46 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by RMP Residential 1 LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Complaint. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]