District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Case #: 1:24-cv-03519
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 4:50 AM EST
Defendant
ROBERT J. CONRAD
Defendant
MERRICK GARLAND
Defendant
SCOTT S. HARRIS
Defendant
ANGELA JIMINEZ
Defendant
ROBERT MEEK
Plaintiff
MICHAEL S. FREEMAN II
3854 Saguaro Circle
Colorado Springs, CO 80925


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 04/17 2:46 PM
USCA Case Number 25-5126 for9 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by MICHAEL S. FREEMAN II. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 04/15 3:26 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court or motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis has been decided re9 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
9 9 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Tue 04/15 3:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to Order on Motion to Stay, by MICHAEL S. FREEMAN II. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/04 11:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER denying8 Emergency Motion: Plaintiff moves for an emergency motion to stay the proceedings in the case Freeman v. Raytheon, et al. , No. 23-11333 (10th Cir.). This Court has no authority to stay proceedings in the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, and otherwise finds no basis for a stay or emergency order. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the motion. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 4, 2025. (lcjmc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 motion Stay Thu 04/03 2:46 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay by MICHAEL S. FREEMAN II. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 respm Response to motion Fri 03/14 9:39 AM
RESPONSE re5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by MICHAEL S. FREEMAN II. ( #1 Certificate of Service) (zdp). Modified docket text on 3/14/2025 (zdp)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/14 2:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension: Having considered the motion, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Court acknowledges that Plaintiff opposes the motion, ECF 7, but the Court nonetheless finds good cause and no prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the complaint in this action by May 16, 2025. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on March 14, 2025. (lcjmc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
6 6 4 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 03/13 1:51 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re3 Motion for Default Judgment filed by SCOTT S. HARRIS, ANGELA JIMINEZ, ROBERT MEEK, ROBERT J. CONRAD, MERRICK GARLAND.(Levy, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/13 1:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by SCOTT S. HARRIS, ANGELA JIMINEZ, ROBERT MEEK, ROBERT J. CONRAD, MERRICK GARLAND.(Levy, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/13 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Levy on behalf of SCOTT S. HARRIS, ANGELA JIMINEZ, ROBERT MEEK, ROBERT J. CONRAD, MERRICK GARLAND(Levy, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 motion Default Judgment Fri 02/21 10:44 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by MICHAEL S. FREEMAN II. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
service Summons Reissued as to AUSA,USAG Fri 01/10 1:47 PM
SUMMONS (5) REISSUED as to ROBERT J. CONRAD, MERRICK GARLAND, SCOTT S. HARRIS, ANGELA JIMINEZ, ROBERT MEEK. These reissued summonses were sent to the pro se plaintiff via email.(zjd)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Fri 01/10 1:49 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued as to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia. This summons was sent to the pro se plaintiff via email. (zjd)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
service Summons Issued Mon 12/30 3:41 PM
Summons (5) Issued as to ROBERT J. CONRAD, MERRICK GARLAND, SCOTT S. HARRIS, ANGELA JIMINEZ, ROBERT MEEK. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Related Case Thu 12/19 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MICHAEL S. FREEMAN II. Case related to Case No. 23-1133 (zdp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/19 9:59 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 208761) with Jury Demand filed by MICHAEL S. FREEMAN II.(zdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit
service Summons Not Issued Thu 12/19 10:00 AM
SUMMONS Not Issued as to All Defendants (zdp)
Related: [-]