USA v. Tanzer
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 3:24-cr-00107 |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 20, 2024 2:19 AM EST |
Defendant
Frederick Louis Tanzer (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/20/2024 3:33 AM EST |
Wednesday, December 11, 2024 | ||
ORAL MOTION for Detention Hearing by USA as to Frederick Louis Tanzer. (ky) [3:24-mj-00735-CHG] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry: Initial Appearance as to Frederick Louis Tanzer held on 12/11/2024. Kelly Rossi and Julie Garcia appeared for the Government. Defendant appeared, acknowledged he had seen the charging document, and was advised of his rights. Defendant indicated he can afford to hire an attorney but has not yet retained one; the Court appointed FPD Cheryll Bennett for today's hearing only, and told Defendant he needs to retain his own counsel after today. The Government summarized the charge and maximum penalties. Detention Hearing set for 12/16/2024 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3 - Dayton before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry. Preliminary Hearing set for 12/20/2024 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3 - Dayton before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry. The Court admonished Defendant to have no contact with any potential witness or persons who may have information in the case. Defendant was remanded to the custody of the USMarshal. (dkc) Modified on 12/13/2024 (dkc). [3:24-mj-00735-CHG] | |
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Friday, December 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Monday, December 16, 2024 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry: Detention Hearing as to Frederick Louis Tanzer held on 12/16/2024. Kelly Rossi and Julie Garcia appeared for the Government. Defendant appeared with his attorney, Patrick Mulligan. Katie Snodgrass appeared for Pretrial Services. Defense indicated that Defendant will waive today's detention hearing; he does not oppose the motion for pretrial detention. The Court finds that the Government has proven by clear and convincing evidence that there are no conditions of release that would reasonably assure the safety of the community if the Defendant were released prior to trial. The Court further finds by a preponderance that there are no conditions of release that would reasonably assure the appearance of the Defendant as required prior to trial. Based upon those findings, and noting the Defendant's non-opposition to the motion, the Court does grant the motion for pretrial detention. The Court will enter a written order to that effect later today. The Government requested that the Court order Defendant again to have no contact whatsoever with any witnesses or anyone who may have any potential information about the case. The Court admonished the Defendant that it is a crime to tamper with a witness or try to intimidate a witness, victim, officer of the court or law enforcement official. Defendant is ordered not to obstruct the investigation, tamper with a witness, victim or informant, retaliate or attempt to retaliate against a witness, victim or informant or intimidate or attempt to intimidate a witness, victim, juror, informant or officer of this Court. (dkc) [3:24-mj-00735-CHG] | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2024 | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Frederick Louis Tanzer: Arraignment set for 12/19/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4 in Dayton before Judge Michael J. Newman. (cem) | ||
12 | 12
![]() |