Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-02263
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 20, 2024 1:16 AM CST
Defendant
Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Abel Guerrero
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Cahal Patrick McColgan
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/20/2024 2:06 AM CST
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
Arrest of Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga, filed. (nc7)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Criminal Complaint as to Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga held on 12/18/2024. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 12/19/2024 at 02:00PM before Magistrate Judge Juan F. Alanis. Due Process Protections Act admonishments provided to Counsel by Court. Appearances: Cahal Patrick McColgan, AUSA; Eva Fa'Alogo, AFPD. (PTS: Alicia Trevino) (ERO: Sophia Reyes) (Interpreter: Maria E. Barrett and Woody Lewis/used) (DUSM: Miguel Ruiz) Deft remanded to custody. (nc7)
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Cahal Patrick McColgan appearing for USA, filed. (McColgan, Cahal)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Abel Guerrero, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga, filed. (Guerrero, Abel)
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 12/18/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (nc7)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga, filed. (nc7)
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga, filed.
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 12/19/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7)
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7)
Related: [-]
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jorge Alberto Barbosa Puga. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (sm7)
Related: [-]