Puerto Rico District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00465
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 20, 2024 3:13 AM AST
Defendant
Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Hector Sueiro-Alvarez
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Steven Liong-Rodriguez
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/20/2024 4:02 AM AST
Monday, December 09, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1). (gr) [3:24-mj-01150-MDM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Issued by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan in case as to Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1). (gr) [3:24-mj-01150-MDM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
Arrest of Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1). (aa) [3:24-mj-01150-MDM]
Related: [-]
4 4 *RESTRICTED* CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1). (aa) [3:24-mj-01150-MDM]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Initial Appearance as to Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1) held on 12/10/2024. Present were AUSA Scott Anderson and AFPD Isabel Mattina-Leal. The defendant was present, under custody and assisted by a certified interpreter. The defendant was advised as to the charges in the Complaint, the maximum penalties that he is exposed to if convicted of those charges, and his rights. After reviewing the CJA-23 form filled by defendant, the Court deemed it appropriate to appoint counsel. Defendant will be represented by the FPD's Office. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant[s], that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant[s] or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. The defendant exercised his right to consular notification. The Government is hereby ordered to notify the Consul of the Dominican Republic, as soon as possible, about the fact that the defendant is facing the charges contained in the criminal complaint of this case. The Court ordered the defendant temporarily detained pending further proceedings. Preliminary Examination/Bail Hearing set for 12/20/2024 at 10:15 AM in Hato Rey Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (Court Reporter DCR.) (Hearing held in Hato Rey Courtroom 5.) Hearing held at 02:55. Hearing ended at 03:03. Interpreter Lisa Solis. (aa) [3:24-mj-01150-MDM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 12/10/2024. (aa) [3:24-mj-01150-MDM]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER scheduling detention hearing as to Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1). Defendant is TEMPORARILY DETAINED pending hearing. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 12/10/2024. (aa) [3:24-mj-01150-MDM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Hector Sueiro-Alvarez appearing for Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1) (Sueiro-Alvarez, Hector) [3:24-mj-01150-MDM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
8 8 ORDER as to Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1): Due to the undersigned's unavailability, the Preliminary Examination/Bail Hearing set for 12/20/2024 will now be held at 2:00 PM in Hato Rey Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 12/17/2024. (aa) Modified on 12/18/2024 to edit typographical error (ecc). [3:24-mj-01150-MDM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
9 9 ***SELECTED PARTIES***Notice of Disclosure of Pretrial Services Report as to Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1). Pretrial Services Reports are made available to Defense Counsel and the Government. The Pretrial Reports are not public record, are not to be produced or disclosed to any other party, and shall remain confidential as provided in Title 18 U.S.C. 3153(c)(1), by Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres, US Probation Office, USA, Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (Leon, Valeria) [3:24-mj-01150-MDM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
10 10 INDICTMENT as to Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1) count(s) 1. (ecc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NPV Indictment
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Hervio Bacilio Mercedes-Torres (1) held on 12/19/2024. Arraignment/Bail set for 12/20/2024 02:00 PM in Hato Rey Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Defendant is U/C.(Court Reporter DCR.)(Hearing held in OSJ Courtroom 6.) (ecc)
Related: [-]