California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-02470
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 3:53 PM PDT
Defendant
Algernon Legrand Lundy (1)
Represented By
Elizabeth M. Barros
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Nicholas DePento
Law Offices Of Nicholas Depento
contact info
Defendant
Regine Gholson (2)
Defendant
Michael Allen Shrewsbury (3)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Keith D. Ellison
Doj-Usao
contact info
Mario Joseph Peia
Doj - U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Henry F. B. Beshar
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/01/2025 3:41 PM PDT
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Algernon Legrand Lundy (1) count(s) 1, 2. (cc: PTS) (sjt) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/25/2024) (sjt). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/25/2024) (sjt). Modified to unseal on 11/25/2024 (sjt).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Indictment