Newbury v. Aser, et al
Original Case: 1:24-cv-00084
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-civil-02137 |
Type | civil / us a party civil case / other statutes |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 20, 2024 4:44 AM EST |
Defendant
US DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PETER ASER, in their official capacity as Director, HUD Providence Field Office - U.S. Dept. of HUD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM MORALES, in their official capacity as Senior Account Executive, Asset Management Division
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARCIA L. FUDGE, in their Official Capacity, Secretary, US Dept of Housing and Urban Development
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHURCH COMMUNITY HOUSING CORPORATION, INC, Board of Directors
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTIAN BELDEN, Executive Director
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN BRYNE, Senior Housing Manager
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARK HASTINGS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARCIA DUCHARME
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NANCY NEWBURY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/20/2024 4:44 AM EST |
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #60) filed by Appellant Nancy Newbury. Transcript Report/Order form due 01/02/2025. 24-2137 (GRC) | ||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
![]() |
||
![]() |