Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 0:24-cv-62394
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:0501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:09 AM EST
Defendant
Tumbaco, Inc.
Plaintiff
Minden Pictures, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel DeSouza
Desouza Law, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 01/21 12:29 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 1/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Fri 01/17 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Minden Pictures, Inc. (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Form AO 120/121 Fri 01/17 10:36 AM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE. (caw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order Closing Case.
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 01/17 10:27 AM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. The parties are hereby directed to file a stipulation of dismissal of all claims signed by all parties pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 1/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
8 8 2 pgs notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 01/16 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Minden Pictures, Inc. (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 01/02 1:12 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Minden Pictures, Inc.. Tumbaco, Inc. served on 12/28/2024, response/answer due 1/21/2025. (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
6 6 misc Form AO 120/121 Fri 12/20 5:22 PM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE. (jas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 12/20 2:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Tumbaco, Inc.. (jas)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Fri 12/20 2:44 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jas)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/20 2:24 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Minden Pictures, Inc. (DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 12/20 1:43 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/20 8:59 AM
COMPLAINT against Tumbaco, Inc. d/b/a Quasar Expeditions. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18067905, filed by Minden Pictures, Inc..(DeSouza, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" TO Complaint - Registration Certificate,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit "B" TO Complaint - Screenshot of Infringement,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Proposed Summons