District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Trevor N Mcfadden
Case #: 1:24-cv-03563
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:28 AM EST
Defendant
GREAT MIDWEST INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant
THOMPSON GROUP CORP.
Plaintiff
WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC
1100 New Jersey Avenue, SE Suite 700
Washington, DC 20003
Represented By
Lucas Webster
Davis, Agnor, Rapaport & Skalny, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/14 10:57 AM
ORDER setting a Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference for June 16, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Dial-in information for the scheduling conference will be sent to the parties. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/14/2025. (lctnm1)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 04/11 9:20 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim13 by WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC.(Webster, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 03/24 6:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC by THOMPSON GROUP CORP..(Kline, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/24 6:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by GREAT MIDWEST INSURANCE COMPANY.(Kline, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Mon 03/24 12:40 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREAT MIDWEST INSURANCE COMPANY served on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/17/2025 (Webster, Lucas) Modified docket text on 3/24/2025 (mg)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Mon 03/24 12:38 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. THOMPSON GROUP CORP. served on 1/16/2025, answer due 2/6/2025 (Webster, Lucas) Modified docket text on 3/24/2025 (mg)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status Mon 03/24 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. THOMPSON GROUP CORP. served on 1/16/2025, answer due 2/6/2025 (Webster, Lucas). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 3/31/2025. (zapb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 03/21 12:59 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREAT MIDWEST INSURANCE COMPANY served on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/17/2025 (Webster, Lucas)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 03/21 12:57 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. THOMPSON GROUP CORP. served on 1/16/2025, answer due 2/6/2025 (Webster, Lucas)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/21 12:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff filed the Complaint in this action on December 20, 2024. As of the date of this Order, the public docket reflects that Plaintiff has yet to file proof of service on the Defendants. The Court directs Plaintiff's attention to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) and Local Civil Rule 5.3. It is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than April 4, 2025, Plaintiff must either cause process to be served upon each Defendant and file proof of service with the Court or establish good cause for the failure to do so. Failure to make such filings will result in dismissal of this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/21/2025. (lctnm1)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/06 12:04 PM
NOTICE Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC re1 Complaint,, (Webster, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
6 6 order Standing Order Mon 12/30 2:10 PM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/30/2024. (lctnm1)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 12/30 12:34 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to GREAT MIDWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, THOMPSON GROUP CORP..(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
4 4 cmp Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED) Mon 12/30 10:13 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC re1 Complaint,, filed by WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC. Related document:1 Complaint,, filed by WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC.(Webster, Lucas) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/30/2024) (znmw)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/30 12:31 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
notice Notice of Error- New Case Mon 12/23 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR The following error(s) need correction: Missing civil cover sheet. Please file the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms using the event Civil Cover Sheet. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
3 3 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Fri 12/20 12:26 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Thompson Group Corp. filed by WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC. Related document:1 Complaint,, filed by WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC.(Webster, Lucas)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Fri 12/20 12:24 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Great Midwest Insurance Co filed by WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC. Related document:1 Complaint,, filed by WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC.(Webster, Lucas)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/20 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT against Great Midwest Insurance Company, Thompson Group Corp. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11371633) filed by WCS CONSTRUCTION LLC.(Webster, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Subcontract Bldg 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Subcontract Bldg 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Bond Bldg 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Bond Bldg 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E-SCOs,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Contract Accounting,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G-Notices to TG,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H-Bond Claim ltrs,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I-4.30.23 penal dmd