Ronquillo v. Solar Mosaic, LLC et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Philip A Brimmer |
Referred: | Kathryn A Starnella |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03526 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2025 |
Case in other court: | District Court, Adams County, Colorado, 24CV0123 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 3:21 AM MST |
Defendant
Solar Mosaic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rogelio Ronquillo
10791 Brighton Road
Brighton, CO 80601 |
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, January 29, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Wed 01/29 4:16 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case. Text Only Entry (dgumb, ) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Joint STIPULATION To Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice by Defendant Solar Mosaic LLC, Plaintiff Rogelio Ronquillo.(dgumb, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
order
Minute Order
Wed 01/15 8:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/15/2025 re: 20 Minute Order. On December 31 2024, the Court ordered plaintiff to file a disclosure statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 that identifies his state citizenship at the time this case was removed for federal court on or before January 7, 2025. See Docket No. 20. No disclosure statement has been filed. Plaintiff shall file a disclosure statement identifying his citizenship on or before January 29, 2025 . Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Abigail Marie Miles on behalf of Solar Mosaic LLCAttorney Abigail Marie Miles added to party Solar Mosaic LLC(pty:dft) (Miles, Abigail) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Minute Order
Tue 12/31 8:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/31/2024. The Notice of Removal asserts that plaintiff is a Colorado citizen, citing the complaint. Docket No.1 at 2. The complaint includes an address for plaintiff in Henderson, Colorado. Docket No.8 at 8. However, even if the Court were to assume that plaintiff resides at this address, residency is not the equivalent of citizenship. Whitelock v. Leatherman , 460 F.2d 507, 514 (10th Cir. 1972) ("allegations of mere 'residence' may not be equated with 'citizenship' for the purposes of establishing diversity."). Based on defendant's representation that the Court has diversity jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332, Docket No.1 at 2, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2) requires that each party file a disclosure of its citizenship. Rule 7.1, as amended in December 2022, states that, "[i]n an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a), a party... must, unless the court orders otherwise, file a disclosure statement. The statement must name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party... when the action is filed in or removed to federal court." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). "For purposes of federal diversity jurisdiction, an individual's state citizenship is equivalent to domicile." Smith v. Cummings , 445 F.3d 1254, 1259 (10th Cir. 2006). "To establish domicile in a particular state, a person must be physically present in the state and intend to remain there." Id . at 1260. On or before January 7, 2025 , plaintiff Rogelio Ronquillo shall file a disclosure statement in accordance with Rule 7.1 identifying his state citizenship at the time this action was removed to federal court. Text Only Entry (pabsec, ) |
|
Friday, December 27, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) |
|
18 | 18
![]() ORDER DRAWING CASE It is ordered that this case be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 12/27/2024. [Case randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. All future pleading shall bear the designation 24-cv-03526-PAB Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley no longer assigned to case. ] (norlin, ) |
|
17 | 17
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Solar Mosaic LLC.(Guite, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Tuesday, December 24, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Reassigning Judge
Tue 12/24 2:58 PM
CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-03526-RTG. (Text Only Entry) (echa, ) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Fri 12/27 11:10 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES. re:14 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Abigail Miles. The s/signature did not match the filer's name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (ccuen, ) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Abigail Miles by Robert James Guite on behalf of Solar Mosaic (Guite, Robert) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 12/20 3:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by USPS by Clerk of Court re 12 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, to Rogelio Ronquillo 10791 Brighton Road Brighton, CO 80601. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 12/20 2:52 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 12/20/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Reassigning Judge
Fri 12/20 2:37 PM
REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-03526-RMR-KAS. (Text only entry.) (echa, ) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Exhibits in Support of1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 3 State Court Filing - Confirmation by Defendant Solar Mosaic. (Guite, Robert) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Exhibits in Support of1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 3 State Court Filing - Summons by Defendant Solar Mosaic. (Guite, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Exhibits in Support of1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 3 State Court Filing - Complaint by Defendant Solar Mosaic. (Guite, Robert) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Exhibits in Support of1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 3 - State Court Filing - Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Solar Mosaic. (Guite, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (echa, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Removal: Administrative Notices
Fri 12/20 11:32 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. Pursuant to Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a, each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry.) (echa, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 12/20 11:32 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (echa, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Fri 12/20 11:24 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (echa, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Mosaic Sustainable Finance Corporation for Solar Mosaic. (Guite, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Solar Mosaic from District Court, Adams County, Colorado, Case Number 24CV0123. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10050631), filed by Solar Mosaic.(Guite, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |