Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-30119

Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Case #: 3:24-ap-03002
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Todd Steven Kapp, Jr.
Represented By
Todd Steven Kapp, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc.
Represented By
Edward B. Claxton, III
Edward B. Claxton Iii, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TriStar Aerial Lift $ Equipment Sales, Inc.
219 East Madison Street
Dublin, GA 31021
Represented By
Edward B. Claxton, III
Edward B. Claxton Iii, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
19 19 court Writ Issued Mon 04/14 3:40 PM
Issued Writ of Execution Related [+] (CCB)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 motion Writ Mon 04/14 2:28 PM
Application for Writ Filed by Edward B. Claxton III on behalf of TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc. (CCB) Writ of Execution (B2640) added on 4/14/2025 (CCB)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 22, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 03/23 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/22/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 order Judgment/Default Judgment Thu 03/20 3:16 PM
Default Judgment Filed on 3/20/2025. The claim of TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc. in the amount of $7,263.62, plus interest at the rate of 4.04% per annum, is excepted from discharge. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
14 14 misc Affidavit/Amended Affidavit/Counter Affidavit Fri 02/21 12:41 PM
Affidavit Re: of Janan Luecke Filed by Edward B. Claxton III on behalf of TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc. Related [+] (Claxton, Edward)
Related: [-] 10 ,13
13 13 motion Entry of Default Fri 02/21 12:35 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Todd Steven Kapp. Jr. Filed by Edward B. Claxton III on behalf of TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc.. Related [+] (Claxton, Edward)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, February 20, 2025
12 12 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/20 12:20 PM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] (CCB)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, February 14, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/15 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 02/12 2:14 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (CCB)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, February 10, 2025
9 9 motion Entry of Default Mon 02/10 9:59 AM
Motion for Entry of Default as to TODD STEVEN KAPP, JR. Filed by Edward B. Claxton III on behalf of TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc.. Related [+] (Claxton, Edward)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Monday, January 06, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Service/Amended Certificate of Service Mon 01/06 2:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Edward B. Claxton III on behalf of TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc. Related [+] (Claxton, Edward)
Related: [-] 1 ,4 ,6
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Mon 01/06 1:35 PM
Amended Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Edward B. Claxton III on behalf of TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc. Related [+] (Claxton, Edward)
Related: [-] 3 ,5
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
6 6 court Summons Issued/Reissued Tue 12/31 3:23 PM
Summons and Notice Requiring Rule 26(f) Report. (CCB)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Defective Pleading Tue 12/31 3:20 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or before: 1/7/2025. (CCB)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, December 30, 2024
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/30 10:43 AM
Amended Complaint To Determine Dischargeability of Debt by Edward B. Claxton III on behalf of TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc. against Todd Steven Kapp, Jr.. Related [+]. (Claxton, Edward)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Mon 12/30 10:36 AM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Edward B. Claxton III on behalf of TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc. Related [+] (Claxton, Edward)
Related: [-] 2
Monday, December 23, 2024
2 2 notice Defective Pleading Mon 12/23 5:02 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or before: 12/30/2024. (VWW)
Related: [-] 1
court Case Assigned Mon 12/23 4:54 PM
Judge Susan D. Barrett added to case (VWW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/19 5:03 PM
Adversary case 24-03002 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)): Complaint by Edward B. Claxton III on behalf of TriStar Aerial Lift & Equipment Sales, Inc., TriStar Aerial Lift $ Equipment Sales, Inc., Todd Steven Kapp, Jr. against Todd Steven Kapp, Jr.. Fee Amount $350 (Claxton, Edward)
Related: [-]