Member Case
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-22497

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John K Sherwood
Case #: 2:24-bk-22498
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.
680 Kinderkamack Road
Oradell, NJ 07649
Represented By
Sari Blair Placona
Mcmanimon Scotland & Baumann, LLC
contact info
Anthony Sodono, III
Mcmanimon, Scotland & Baumann, LLC
contact info
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 2:26 PM EST
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
David Gerardi
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
17 17 misc Amended Schedules (Fee) - Use for All Amended Schedules Mon 03/03 3:06 PM
Amended Schedule(s) : A/B,Summary of Schedules,Other Schedules re:Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.. (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Tue 02/18 12:14 PM
Missing Document(s): 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.. (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-]
utility Remark re: Missing Documents Filed Tue 02/18 2:37 PM
Remar Related [+]. STILL MISSING: No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-] 15 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.,16 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Tue 02/18 5:08 PM
Hearing Withdrawn- documents have been filed. Related [+] (mff)
Related: [-] 9 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable), Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/27/2024. Hearing scheduled for 1/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.
Friday, February 14, 2025
15 15 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Fri 02/14 2:15 PM
Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.. (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
14 14 misc Change of Address Wed 01/22 10:11 AM
Change of Address for Wachtel, Zev From: 121 Stonehurst Drive, Tenafly, NJ 07670 To: 431 Summit Street, Englewood Cliffs, NJ 07632 filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.. (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 01/21 5:07 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 1/21/2025 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
Related: [-] 9 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable), Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/27/2024. Hearing scheduled for 1/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Fri 01/17 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 37. Notice Date 01/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
utility Add Trustee Thu 01/16 12:31 PM
Trustee Nicole M. Nigrelli Added to Case Per Notice of Appointment as Subchapter V Trustee (Document No. 26 in Lead Case No. 24-22497 . (jpp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
12 12 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 01/14 4:08 PM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/19/2025 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 2/28/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/18/2025. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
11 11 misc Change of Address Tue 01/07 11:07 AM
Change of Address for Glenn Gymrek From: 118 Park Avenue, Midland Park, NJ 07432 To: 308 Sleepy Hollow Lane, Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.. (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 29, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 12/30 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
9 9 order Show Cause Fri 12/27 10:49 AM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable), Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/27/2024. Hearing scheduled for 1/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
8 8 order Joint Administration Thu 12/26 2:37 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 24-22497 Member Cases: 24-22497 24-22500 24-22501 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/26/2024. (zlh)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 6 pgs motion Joint Administration Mon 12/23 1:09 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-22497 24-22498 24-22500 and 24-22501 Filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.. (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 12/20 7:46 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by David Gerardi on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Gerardi, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 12/20 2:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Sari Blair Placona on behalf of Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.. (Placona, Sari)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Amended Schedules (Fee) - Use for All Amended Schedules Fri 12/20 2:15 PM
Amended Schedule(s) : Other Schedules re:Petition (To Correct Description of Debtor's Business) filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.. (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned Fri 12/20 2:05 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Stacey L. Meisel removed from the case. Judge John K. Sherwood added to the case. (rah)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned Fri 12/20 1:53 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Stacey L. Meisel added to the case. (rah)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 12/20 1:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of Sovereign Medical Services, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 04/21/2025.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 01/10/2025 (Sodono, Anthony)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 12/20 2:14 PM
Remark: Associated Cases 20-12645 and 23-14988 (rah)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Fri 12/20 2:22 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-22498 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47609888, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Terminate Deadline Fri 12/20 3:25 PM
Appointment of HC ombudsman Deadline Terminated, Reason: Incorrect Nature of Business listed upon case initiation. (dmc)
Related: [-]