Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:24-cv-03698
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:47 AM EST
Petitioner
Optavia LLC
Represented By
Jacob A. Englander
Lazare Potter Giacovas & Moyle LLP
contact info
Robert A Giacovas
Lazare Potter Giacovas & Moyle LLP
contact info
Megan Jeannette McGinnis
Miles & Stockbridge P.C.
contact info
Respondent
Gia (Marj) Mendez
Respondent
Rick Mendez


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/10 2:28 PM
ORDER Re: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/10/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
10 10 3 pgs corresp Miscellaneous Fri 02/07 3:21 PM
Correspondence re: Optavia's Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (ECF No. 1) (McGinnis, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
9 9 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/13 11:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optavia LLC. Rick Mendez served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025.(McGinnis, Megan)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/13 11:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Optavia LLC. Gia (Marj) Mendez served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025.(McGinnis, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/30 2:07 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert A Giacovas. Directing attorney Robert A Giacovas to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/30 2:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jacob A. Englander. Directing attorney Jacob A. Englander to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
5 5 2 pgs motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/24 10:12 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert A. Giacovas (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11679089.) by Optavia LLC(McGinnis, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 12/23 2:55 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Gia (Marj) Mendez and Rick Mendez.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Rick Mendez
3 3 2 pgs motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/23 1:30 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacob A. Englander (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11677891.) by Optavia LLC(McGinnis, Megan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Mon 12/23 10:39 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Optavia LLC identifying Corporate Parent Jason Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Medifast, Inc. for Optavia LLC.(McGinnis, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/20 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT - Petition to Confirm Arbitral Award against Gia (Marj) Mendez, Rick Mendez ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11674577.), filed by Optavia LLC.(McGinnis, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 27 pgs Exhibit A to Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Petition,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Petition,
Att: 5 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons