Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-35749

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:24-ap-03271
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nestor Bilfredo Mena
8213 N. Tahoe Dr.
Jersey Village, TX 77040
Represented By
Nestor Bilfredo Mena
contact info
Plaintiff
Smyrna Ready Mix Concrete LLC d/b/a SRM Concrete
Crady Jewett McCulley & Houren LLP 2727 Allen Parkway, Suite 1700
Houston, TX 77019
Represented By
William R Sudela
Crady Jewett And Mcculley
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/16 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Generic Order (Adversary)
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 order Generic Order (Adversary) Mon 04/14 9:12 AM
Order Cancelling. Signed on 4/14/2025 (njc7)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 04/07 5:05 PM
Summons Service Executed on Nestor Bilfredo Mena 4/2/2025. (Rose, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 03/05 4:30 PM
Summons Issued on Nestor Bilfredo Mena Date Issued 3/5/2025. (rlm4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 03/04 2:46 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Nestor Bilfredo Mena. (Filed By Smyrna Ready Mix Concrete LLC d/b/a SRM Concrete ). (Rose, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/14 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order to Show Cause
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
2 2 order Show Cause Wed 02/12 1:50 PM
Order to Show Cause Signed on 2/12/2025 Electronic Show Cause hearing to be held on 4/15/2025 at 10:30 AM via telephone and video conference. (njc7)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Fri 12/20 11:28 AM
Adversary case 24-03271 Nature of Suit: (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) Complaint Objecting To Dischargeability Of Indebtedness by Smyrna Ready Mix Concrete LLC d/b/a SRM Concrete against Nestor Bilfredo Mena. Fee Amount $350 (Sudela, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1