Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 8:24-cv-03704
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:48 AM EST
Defendant
St. Mary's County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Alexis Ifeanyi Gbemudu
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
John E O'Connor
[Journalist For] The Chesapeake Today Newspaper P.O. Box 822
Mechanicsville, MD 20659


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 23, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/23 2:50 PM
Marginal ORDER approving10 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by St. Mary's County Sheriff's Department, John E O'Connor. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 1/23/2025. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/17 2:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by John E O'Connor, St. Mary's County Sheriff's Department(Gbemudu, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
9 9 order Case Management Order Mon 01/06 12:42 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 1/6/2025. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
8 8 misc Rule 12/56 Fri 12/27 9:42 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to John E O'Connor (c/m 12/27/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss Thu 12/26 1:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant St. Mary's County Sheriff's Office by St. Mary's County Sheriff's Department(Gbemudu, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, December 23, 2024
6 6 corresp Miscellaneous Mon 12/23 12:22 PM
Correspondence to John E O'Connor re: Removal Notification Letter (c/m 12/23/24- jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Mon 12/23 12:13 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (c/m 12/23/24-jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/23 11:11 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Judge Peter J. Messitte no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
4 4 cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 12:09 PM
AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT against St. Mary's County Sheriff's Department, filed by John E O'Connor.(jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 12:05 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against St. Mary's County Sheriff's Office, filed by John E O'Connor.(jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U,
Att: 22 Exhibit V,
Att: 23 Exhibit W,
Att: 24 Exhibit X,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 12/20 3:33 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by St. Mary's County Sheriff's Office (Gbemudu, Alexis)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 12/20 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Saint Mary's County, case number C-18-CV-24-000881. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11675111), filed by St. Mary's County Sheriff's Office.(Gbemudu, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Statement of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Attachment State Court Civil Coversheet,
Att: 4 Attachment Writ of Summons,
Att: 5 Attachment State Court Complaint,
Att: 6 Attachment Complaint Ex. A,
Att: 7 Attachment Complaint Ex. B,
Att: 8 Attachment Complaint Ex. C,
Att: 9 Attachment Complaint Ex. D,
Att: 10 Attachment Complaint Ex. E,
Att: 11 Attachment Complaint Ex. F,
Att: 12 Attachment Complaint Ex. G,
Att: 13 Attachment Complaint Ex. H,
Att: 14 Attachment Complaint Ex. I,
Att: 15 Attachment Complaint Ex. J,
Att: 16 Attachment Complaint Ex. K,
Att: 17 Attachment Complaint Ex. L,
Att: 18 Attachment Complaint Ex. M,
Att: 19 Attachment Complaint Ex. N,
Att: 20 Attachment Complaint Ex. O,
Att: 21 Attachment Complaint Ex. P,
Att: 22 Attachment Complaint Ex. Q,
Att: 23 Attachment Complaint Ex. R,
Att: 24 Attachment Complaint Ex. S,
Att: 25 Attachment Complaint Ex. T,
Att: 26 Attachment Complaint Ex. U,
Att: 27 Attachment Complaint Ex. V,
Att: 28 Attachment Complaint Ex. W,
Att: 29 Attachment Complaint Ex. X,
Att: 30 Attachment Complaint Ex. Y,
Att: 31 Attachment Amended Complaint,
Att: 32 Attachment Affidavit of Service,
Att: 33 Attachment Affidavit of Service,
Att: 34 Attachment Affidavit of Service,
Att: 35 Attachment State Court Notice of Removal,
Att: 36 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet
utility Remark - State Court Docs Mon 12/23 12:11 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ST. MARY'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]