New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Referred: Henry J Ricardo
Case #: 1:24-cv-09851
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:51 AM EST
Defendant
Hui Fang
Represented By
Hsien Chih Kung
Jia Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Yang Gao
Represented By
Hsien Chih Kung
Jia Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Erica Maurer
Represented By
Hsien Chih Kung
Jia Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mixx Lifestyle Inc.
Represented By
Hsien Chih Kung
Jia Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dartel McRae
Represented By
Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Joseph, Herzfeld, Hester, & Kirschenbaum
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
20 20 order Case Management Plan Tue 03/18 12:55 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties do not consent to a trial before a Magistrate Judge at this time. Amended Pleadings due by 4/17/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 4/17/2025. Deposition due by 7/11/2025. Fact Discovery due by 7/18/2025. The case is to be tried to a jury. The parties anticipate that the trial of this case will require 3-5 days. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo on 3/18/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 03/18 11:34 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo: Deadlines. Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/18/2025. See transcript for details. Transcript for this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached Order Form. (rdz)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 03/17 9:48 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice17 Letter Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff's motion is denied without prejudice as premature. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo)(Text Only Order)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
17 17 motion Discovery Fri 03/14 11:26 AM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo from Josef Nussbaum dated March 14, 2025. Document filed by Dartel McRae..(Nussbaum, Yosef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
16 16 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 03/05 2:15 PM
ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16: The Court shall hold a case management conference on March 18, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. by telephone. Counsel should contact chambers using the Court's conference line, +1 646-453-4442 (Conference ID: 716 042 132#). Initial Conference set for 3/18/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo on 3/5/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/04 11:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Mixx Lifestyle Inc., Yang Gao, Hui Fang, Erica Maurer..(Kung, Hsien)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/04 11:53 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mixx Lifestyle Inc., Yang Gao, Hui Fang, Erica Maurer..(Kung, Hsien)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/14 9:56 AM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' answer is now due March 2, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo)(Text Only Order)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/14 9:54 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' answer is now due March 2, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo)(Text Only Order)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 02/13 10:16 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry J Ricardo. Motions referred to Henry J Ricardo. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/12/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/11 4:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yosef Nussbaum on behalf of Dartel McRae..(Nussbaum, Yosef)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/31 11:01 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo from Mixx Lifestyle Inc. d/b/a Nebula NY dated January 31, 2025. Document filed by Mixx Lifestyle Inc...(Kung, Hsien)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/31 11:00 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo from Yang Gao, Hui Fang, and Erica Maurer dated January 31, 2025. Document filed by Yang Gao, Hui Fang, Erica Maurer..(Kung, Hsien)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/31 10:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hsien Chih Kung on behalf of Mixx Lifestyle Inc...(Kung, Hsien)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/31 10:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hsien Chih Kung on behalf of Yang Gao, Hui Fang, Erica Maurer..(Kung, Hsien)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/15 9:31 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Hui Fang served on 1/13/2025, answer due 2/3/2025; Yang Gao served on 1/13/2025, answer due 2/3/2025; Erica Maurer served on 1/13/2025, answer due 2/3/2025; Mixx Lifestyle Inc. served on 1/10/2025, answer due 1/31/2025. Service was accepted by Frank Mchugh, Co-worker. Document filed by Dartel McRae..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service upon Erica Maurer,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service upon Hui Fang,
Att: 3 Affidavit Affiavit of Service upon Yang Gao
Monday, December 23, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 12/23 10:54 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hui Fang, Yang Gao, Erica Maurer, Mixx Lifestyle Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 12/23 10:51 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 12/23 10:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 12/23 10:52 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/23 10:52 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 12/23 10:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dartel McCrae; Mixx Lifestyle Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 12/20 4:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mixx Lifestyle Inc.d/b/a Nebula NY, Yang Gao, Hui Fang and Erica Maurer, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Dartel McCrae..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/20 4:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/20 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Hui Fang, Yang Gao, Erica Maurer, Mixx Lifestyle Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30367358)Document filed by Dartel McCrae..(Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to sue