New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Rochon
Case #: 1:24-cv-09852
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:51 AM EST
Defendant
Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Michael Tremonte
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Erica Ashley Wolff
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Michael Tremonte
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Erica Ashley Wolff
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bad Boy Entertainment LLC
Represented By
Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Michael Tremonte
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Erica Ashley Wolff
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Michael Tremonte
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Erica Ashley Wolff
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bad Boy Productions LLC
Represented By
Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Michael Tremonte
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Erica Ashley Wolff
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bad Boy Records LLC
Represented By
William Laurence Charron
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Nicholas George Saady
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Donald S. Zakarin
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
CE Opco, LLC
Represented By
Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Michael Tremonte
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Erica Ashley Wolff
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sean Combs
Represented By
Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Michael Tremonte
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Erica Ashley Wolff
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Defendant
Daddy's House Recordings Inc.
Represented By
Mark Elliot Cuccaro
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Michael Tremonte
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Erica Ashley Wolff
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info
Defendant
Individual Does 1-10
Defendant
Organizational Does 1-10
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
Antigone Curis
Merson Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
54 54 motion Extension of Time Tue 04/29 10:50 AM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Counsel for All Parties dated April 29, 2025. Document filed by Bad Boy Books Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Entertainment LLC, Bad Boy Productions Holdings, Inc., Bad Boy Productions LLC, CE Opco, LLC, Sean Combs, Daddy's House Recordings Inc...(Cuccaro, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Doe v. Combs, 24-cv-08808 (JAV), Dkt. #50,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Doe v. Combs, 24-cv-07776 (NRB), Dkt. #69
Friday, April 25, 2025
53 53 11 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 6:27 PM
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:34 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Curis, Antigone)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
52 52 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/23 2:23 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss was due April 22, 2025. Dkts. 40, 41. That date has now passed without Plaintiff filing her opposition. If the Court does not receive Plaintiff's opposition papers by April 25, 2025, it will treat the motion to dismiss as unopposed. Related [+] (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
Related: [-] sponses due by 4/25/2025.