Wyoming District Court
Judge:Scott W Skavdahl
Referred: Scott P Klosterman
Case #: 1:24-cv-00268
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 - Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:48 AM MST
Defendant
Mundt Energy Services LLC
Represented By
Hannah Engle
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Christopher Ryan Jones
Gordon & Rees
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Blood
Represented By
Gregory Bruce Asay
Associated Legal Group
contact info
Bruce S Asay
Associated Legal Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Blood
Represented By
Gregory Bruce Asay
Associated Legal Group
contact info
Bruce S Asay
Associated Legal Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, February 28, 2025
17 17 respm Reply Fri 02/28 4:16 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Mundt Energy Services LLC. (Jones, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/21 1:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Stephen Blood, Mary Blood. (Asay, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
15 15 order Order Mon 02/10 3:49 PM
(TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl permitting the filing of an Amended Brief in Support of Defendant's11 Motion to Dismiss and extending Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendant's11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file their response on or before February 24, 2025. (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Brief Mon 02/10 11:57 AM
Amended BRIEF in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re12 Brief filed by Defendant Mundt Energy Services LLC. (Engle, Hannah)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/10 11:44 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Mundt Energy Services LLC re12 Brief of Filing Amended Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Engle, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
12 12 respm Brief Tue 01/28 11:31 AM
BRIEF in Support of11 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Mundt Energy Services LLC. (Separated and re-filed from11 attachments) (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 01/27 4:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Mundt Energy Services LLC.(Engle, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Friday, January 17, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice) Fri 01/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Hannah Engle on behalf of Mundt Energy Services LLC Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2566263. (Engle, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/15 8:55 AM
ORDER by the Honorable Scott P Klosterman granting8 MOTION for Hanna E. Engle to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Mundt Energy Services LLC (cc: counsel via email) (Court Staff, semt) Modified judge association on 1/15/2025 (Court Staff, semt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/14 12:38 PM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Scott P Klosterman. MOTION for Hanna E. Engle to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Mundt Energy Services LLC.(Jones, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Hannah E. Engle in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Friday, January 10, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/10 1:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Blood, Mary Blood. Mundt Energy Services LLC served on 12/23/2024, answer due on 1/27/2025 (Asay, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive Fri 01/10 8:26 AM
ORDER by the Honorable Scott P. Klosterman, U.S. Magistrate Judge, granting5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including January 27, 2025, to answer or otherwise respond to1 Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Court Staff, snjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) Thu 01/09 4:17 PM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Scott P Klosterman. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Mundt Energy Services LLC. (Jones, Christopher)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/09 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Ryan Jones on behalf of Mundt Energy Services LLC (Jones, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
3 3 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/02 12:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Stephen Blood, Mary Blood (Asay, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, December 20, 2024
2 2 misc Jury Demand Fri 12/20 4:18 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiffs Stephen Blood and Mary Blood. (Court Staff, szf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/20 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT (one summons issued), filed by Stephen Blood, Mary Blood. (Filing fee paid in full on December 20, 2024, $405 Receipt #CHY4021.) (Court Staff, szf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet