New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Referred: Robyn F Tarnofsky
Case #: 1:24-cv-09859
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332nr Diversity: Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:52 AM EST
Defendant
BDO USA, P.C.
Represented By
Michael J. Sheehan
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Lindsay Faye Ditlow
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Nicholas Meyer
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Agnieszka Chomicz
Represented By
Michelle Anne Caiola
Phillips And Associates
contact info
Jonathan Martin Goldhirsch
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Tue 05/13 5:03 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Lindsay F. Ditlow dated 5/13/25 re: Joint update regarding the status of discovery. Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Ditlow, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Protective Order Tue 05/13 11:08 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 5/13/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
26 26 misc Proposed Protective Order Mon 05/12 2:39 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Ditlow, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion to Quash Fri 05/09 5:12 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Quash. As discussed at the conference on May 9, 2025, Plaintiff's motion to quash is GRANTED. Defendants may, if appropriate after further development of the record, seek to take the discovery that is the subject of the quashed subpoena. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky)(Text Only Order) (ah)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 05/09 5:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky: Status Conference held on 5/9/2025. (ah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
23 23 respm Response to Motion Tue 05/06 3:09 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Lindsay F. Ditlow dated May 6, 2025 re:21 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas . . Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Ditlow, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, May 02, 2025
22 22 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/02 9:47 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic conference is scheduled for Friday, May 9, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. The parties should be prepared to discuss Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas [ECF 21]. The parties are directed to join the conference at the scheduled time. Please dial (646) 453-4442, Access Code: 107 424 036#. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky) (Text Only Order) (ah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
21 21 motion Quash Thu 05/01 5:38 PM
MOTION to Quash Subpoenas . Document filed by Agnieszka Chomicz..(Caiola, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - BDO Subpoenas
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
19 19 order Case Management Plan Wed 01/22 3:52 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND REPORT OF RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE: The parties anticipate that the trial of this case will require 4 days. The parties request a jury trial. The parties do not consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction at this time. Amended Pleadings due by 2/27/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 2/27/2025. Deposition due by 6/16/2025. Fact Discovery due by 7/21/2025. Expert Discovery due by 7/14/2025. Ready for Trial by 9/22/2025. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 1/22/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/22 12:01 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL J. SHEEHAN granting17 MOTION for Michael J. Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Michael J. Sheehan, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 1/22/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/22 9:23 AM
MOTION for Michael J. Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-30470225 . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Sheehan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A: gs certificates,
Att: 3 Proposed Order proposed order
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 01/22 10:06 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 17 MOTION for Michael J. Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt number ANYSDC-30470225. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
16 16 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 01/21 1:10 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Agnieszka Chomicz..(Caiola, Michelle)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 01/21 3:50 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/19/2025 at 10:00 AM in Counsel's Office.(sni)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/16 10:40 AM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for Michael J. Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30470225. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Sheehan, Michael) Modified on 1/16/2025 (bc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A: gs certificates,
Att: 3 Proposed Order proposed order
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/16 12:01 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 15 MOTION for Michael J. Sheehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30470225. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
14 14 minutes Status Conference Mon 01/13 2:04 PM
ORDER The parties shall file a proposed case management order by January 21, 2025. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky: Status Conference held on 1/13/2025. (ah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/08 1:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:A telephonic conference is scheduled for Monday, January 13, 2025 at 12:00 pm. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of the case. The parties are directed to join the conference at the scheduled time. Please dial (646) 453-4442, Access Code: 872 321 000#. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky) (Text Only Order) (ah)
Related: [-]
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Wed 01/08 11:04 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/7/2025.(sge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/07 10:51 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/7/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 9:43 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Martin Goldhirsch on behalf of Agnieszka Chomicz..(Goldhirsch, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Anne Caiola on behalf of Agnieszka Chomicz..(Caiola, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
9 9 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 12/30 1:38 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/13/2025. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/01/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/27 2:19 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Ditlow, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/27 9:54 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Lindsay Faye Ditlow to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here NYSD form page (kw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
7 7 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 12/26 12:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Ditlow, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/23 3:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ditlow, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/23 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Meyer on behalf of BDO USA, P.C...(Meyer, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 12/23 3:02 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 12/23 3:02 PM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 12/23 3:03 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 12/23 3:03 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lindsay Faye Ditlow. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/23 3:03 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lindsay Faye Ditlow to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple citizenships for the defendant were selected. Choose one. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/20 5:41 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Faye Ditlow on behalf of BDO USA, P.C...(Ditlow, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/20 5:39 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Ditlow, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/20 5:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ditlow, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 12/20 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 160855/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30368346).Document filed by BDO USA, P.C...(Ditlow, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Stipulation of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - R. Reimink Declaration