Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Referred: Regina D Cannon
Case #: 1:24-cv-05852
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2024
Case in other court:Georgia Southern, 1:24-cv-00229
Defendant
Allen H. Bright Esq.
Defendant
BE Davis
Defendant
Carl Greenberg
Defendant
Courtnay Johnson, Esq.
Defendant
Dekalb County
Defendant
DeKalb County District Attorney's Office
Defendant
DeKalb County Police Department
Defendant
DeKalb County Sheriff's Office
Defendant
Dekalb County Superior Court
Defendant
Dennis R. Scheib
Defendant
Elise Wells
Defendant
Gail Flake
Defendant
Georgia Bureau of Investigation
Defendant
Georgia Department of Corrections
Defendant
Georgia Department of Public Safety
Defendant
Georgia State Board of Pardons and Paroles
Defendant
Gerald Kleinrock
Defendant
Governor of Georgia
Defendant
Gwendolyn Fleming
Defendant
JH King
Defendant
Judy Nicholson
Defendant
Melvin Abercrombie
Defendant
Mike Maloof
Defendant
Public Defender's Office, Dekalb County
Defendant
Raymond S. Davis
Defendant
RL Brewer
Defendant
Robert Clay Watts
Defendant
SJ Cheek
Defendant
State of Georgia
Defendant
SW Waits
Defendant
Tony Mathis
Defendant
Warden, Augusta State Medical Prison ("ASMP")
Plaintiff
James Lynn Nichols

GPO Dec 20 2024
ORDER transferring this case to the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/20/2024. (amd) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 12/20/2024.]

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
39 39 service Certificate of Service Wed 04/02 9:44 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certified mail receipts for re38 Certificate of Service filed by James Lynn Nichols (jkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
38 38 service Certificate of Service Thu 03/13 11:10 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of complaint & summons on 3/11/2025, no names of defendants were listed filed by James Lynn Nichols (jkb)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Default Judgment Thu 03/13 11:08 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to All defendants by James Lynn Nichols.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Writ,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Certificate of service
36 36 motion Clerks Entry of Default Thu 03/13 11:04 AM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/19 9:22 AM
Submission of25 MOTION to Produce Grand Jury material and information MOTION to Compel Grand Jury material and information,23 MOTION for Extension of Time deadlines in the above-captioned case, vacating the judgment enteredMOTION for Order,27 MOTION for production of documents,34 MOTION for Extension of Time,33 MOTION,28 MOTION for Preliminary InjunctionMOTION release and monetary compensation,35 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena,32 MOTION,30 MOTION for Hearing,24 MOTION,26 MOTION for Service,29 MOTION, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/05 1:32 PM
Submission of21 MOTION for Service,19 MOTION for Extension of Time MOTION to Vacate,22 MOTION,20 MOTION for Hearing,12 MOTION for funds for service of summons and subpoenas,18 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis,10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction,11 MOTION for Appointment of Process Server, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
33 33 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/03 12:55 PM
MOTION to Initiate a Criminal Investigation by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/03 12:53 PM
MOTION for Admission by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
31 31 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/03 12:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Melvin Abercrombie, RL Brewer, SJ Cheek, Gail Flake, Carl Greenberg, Courtnay Johnson, Esq., JH King, Mike Maloof, Tony Mathis, Judy Nicholson, Dennis R. Scheib, State of Georgia, SW Waits, Robert Clay Watts, Chris Carr, Wade Damron, Allan H. Bright, Brian Kemp, Darius Pattillo, Darryl A. Kitchen, Mirtha Ramos, Benjamin E. Davis, DeShawn Jones, Gerald Kleinrock, Gwendolyn Keyes Fleming, Raymond S. Davis, Holly A. Pierson, Leonora Grant filed by James Lynn Nichols.(jkb)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Hearing Mon 02/03 11:28 AM
MOTION to Schedule Early Planning Conference by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/03 11:20 AM
MOTION to Suppress Evidence by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Preliminary Injunction Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/03 11:19 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION Release and Monetary Compensation by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/03 11:17 AM
MOTION for production of documents by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Service Mon 02/03 11:13 AM
MOTION for Service by Clerkby James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Produce Compel Mon 02/03 11:11 AM
MOTION to Produce Grand Jury material and information, MOTION to Compel Grand Jury material and information by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/03 11:07 AM
MOTION for request to manually filing exhibits under seal and Notice of updated list of witnesses to be sealed. by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time For Order Mon 02/03 11:05 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time deadlines to file in the above-captioned case, vacating the judgment entered, MOTION for Order by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/29 12:08 PM
Submission of5 MOTION to Seal,8 MOTION,9 MOTION for Clarification re:1 Complaint,3 Order, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/21 8:31 AM
MOTION requesting information about the representation of the defendants in this caseby James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Service Tue 01/21 8:29 AM
MOTION for Service by James Lynn Nichols.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Subpoena,
Att: 2 Subpoena
20 20 motion Hearing Tue 01/21 8:27 AM
MOTION to schedule early planning conference by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time Vacate Tue 01/21 8:26 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time of filing deadlines, MOTION to Vacate judgment entered on the criminal matter by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Application to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/21 8:23 AM
APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
35 35 motion Issuance of Subpoena Tue 02/18 12:11 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena by James Lynn Nichols. (bgt)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Extension of Time Tue 02/18 12:04 PM
MOTION to extend filing deadlines and complaint regarding chief deputy clerk by James Lynn Nichols. (bgt)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Fri 01/17 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Filing Response to Order for transfer to the Northern District by James Lynn Nichols (jkb)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Fri 01/17 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Filing Response to claim by James Lynn Nichols (jkb)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account Fri 01/17 12:53 PM
Proposed Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Filing Fri 01/17 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Filing by James Lynn Nichols (jkb)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Fri 01/17 12:50 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/17 12:49 PM
MOTION for funds for service of summons and subpoenas by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb) (jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/17/2025) Attachment,
Att: 2 (1/17/2025) Attachment 2
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/17 12:46 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Process Server by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 01/17 12:44 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by James Lynn Nichols.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
9 9 motion Clarification Mon 01/13 2:12 PM
MOTION for Clarification, response to order to transfer re:1 Complaint,3 Order by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/31 3:39 PM
MOTION for Wavier of Ante Litem Requirement by James Lynn Nichols.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of and request 2,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law in support
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Tue 12/31 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Filing Subpoena Duces Tecum and Subpoena for production of documents by James Lynn Nichols. (forwarded from USDC SDGA)(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Subpoena for production of documents
6 6 respoth Affidavit in Support Tue 12/31 3:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re1 Complaint by James Lynn Nichols. (jkb)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Seal (misc.) Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/31 3:32 PM
MOTION to Seal exhibits until the appropriate time for disclosure, MOTION to appointment of expert witnesses in the fields of forensic toxicology, medical examination, and legal analysis from the Department of Justice to provide authoritative testimony. by James Lynn Nichols. (Documents forwarded from USDC SDGA) (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 12/20 9:29 AM
Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-00229. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order Fri 12/20 9:01 AM
ORDER transferring this case to the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/20/2024. (amd) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 12/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 12/20 9:30 AM
Submission of2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (aar)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Lynn Nichols. Responses due by 12/31/2024. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (SLC) Modified on 12/17/2024 (kjm). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 12/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Lynn Nichols. (SLC) Modified on 12/17/2024 (kjm). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 12/20/2024.]
Related: [-]