Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-07480
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Case in other court:Alabama Northern, 3:24-cv-01063
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 4:31 AM EST
Defendant
3M Company Inc
Represented By
Brett E. Legner
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Jonathan R Little
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
M Christian King
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Lightfoot Franklin And White LLC
contact info
William Larkin Radney, IV
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
Michael A. Scodro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Kayla Rose Williams
Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC
contact info
Wesley B Gilchrist
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
William H Morrow
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
Defendant
BFI Waste Systems of Alabama, LLC
Represented By
William G Beck
Lathrop And Gage
contact info
Matthew A. Walker
Lathrop Gpm, LLP
contact info
John Winston Scott
Scott Dukes & Geisler PC
contact info
Jessica K. Rosell
contact info
Christian Collier Feldman
Scott Dukes & Geisler
contact info
Defendant
BFI Waste Systems of North America, LLC
Represented By
William G Beck
Lathrop And Gage
contact info
Matthew A. Walker
Lathrop Gpm, LLP
contact info
John Winston Scott
Scott Dukes & Geisler PC
contact info
Jessica K. Rosell
contact info
Christian Collier Feldman
Scott Dukes & Geisler
contact info
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Represented By
Allen M Estes
Balch And Bingham LLP
contact info
Christopher L Yeilding
Balch & Bingham LLP
contact info
G Rick Hall
Loftin Holt Hall & Hargett, LLP
contact info
Thomas R DeBray, Jr
Balch And Bingham LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dyneon LLC
Defendant
Toray Fluorofibers (America) Inc
Represented By
Allison R. Bendall
Lloyd Gray, Whitehead & Monroe
contact info
Caleigh Miller Hart
Lloyd Gray Whitehead And Monroe PC
contact info
E Britton Monroe
Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe PC
contact info
Defendant
Ralph G Werling
Represented By
Allen M Estes
Balch And Bingham LLP
contact info
Gregory C Cook
Balch & Bingham LLP
contact info
Christopher L Yeilding
Balch & Bingham LLP
contact info
G Rick Hall
Loftin Holt Hall & Hargett, LLP
contact info
Thomas R DeBray, Jr
Balch And Bingham LLP
contact info
Defendant
Justin White
Represented By
William G Beck
Lathrop And Gage
contact info
Matthew A. Walker
Lathrop Gpm, LLP
contact info
John Winston Scott
Scott Dukes & Geisler PC
contact info
Jessica K. Rosell
contact info
Christian Collier Feldman
Scott Dukes & Geisler
contact info
Plaintiff
Colbert County Alabama
Represented By
D Edgar Black
Black & Hughston PC
contact info
Glenn Murdock
Glenn Murdock
contact info
Ethan Robert Wright
Friedman, Dazio, & Zulanas, P.C.
contact info
Lee T Patterson
Friedman Dazzio & Zulanas PC
contact info
Matthew David Conn
Friedman Dazzio & Zulanas PC
contact info
Jeffrey Edwin Friedman, Jr
Friedman Dazzio & Zulanas, PC
contact info
Jeff Friedman
Friedman Dazzio And Zulanas PC
contact info
Jeffrey E Friedman
Friedman Dazzio & Zulanas PC
contact info
John Andrew McReynolds, IV
Bedford, Rogers, Bowling & Mcreynolds PC
contact info
Jeffrey L Bowling
Bedford Rogers & Bowling PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Colbert County Water Department
Represented By
D Edgar Black
Black & Hughston PC
contact info
Glenn Murdock
Glenn Murdock
contact info
Ethan Robert Wright
Friedman, Dazio, & Zulanas, P.C.
contact info
Lee T Patterson
Friedman Dazzio & Zulanas PC
contact info
Matthew David Conn
Friedman Dazzio & Zulanas PC
contact info
Jeffrey Edwin Friedman, Jr
Friedman Dazzio & Zulanas, PC
contact info
Jeff Friedman
Friedman Dazzio And Zulanas PC
contact info
Jeffrey E Friedman
Friedman Dazzio & Zulanas PC
contact info
John Andrew McReynolds, IV
Bedford, Rogers, Bowling & Mcreynolds PC
contact info
Jeffrey L Bowling
Bedford Rogers & Bowling PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
59 59 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 1:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re (7006 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 61 in 2:24-cv-07479-RMG, 56 in 2:24-cv-07480-RMG) MOTION to Stay (3M Company's Motion to Stay Briefing of Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand) Response filed by Colbert County Alabama, Colbert County Water Department, Muscle Shoals Utilities Board, Muscle Shoals, Alabama, City of.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/2/2025 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-07479-RMG, 2:24-cv-07480-RMG(Friedman, Jeff) Modified to edit docket text, clerk deleted Motion event inadvertently spread to incorrect member case 2:23-cv-03868 on 4/25/2025 (rhei, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
58 58 misc Status Report Fri 04/18 2:29 PM
STATUS REPORT General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Justin White. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-07479-RMG, 2:24-cv-07480-RMG(Beck, William)
Related: [-]
57 57 misc Status Report Fri 04/18 2:23 PM
STATUS REPORT General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BFI Waste Systems of Alabama, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-07479-RMG, 2:24-cv-07480-RMG(Beck, William)
Related: [-]