Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00469
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2024 2:28 AM EST
Defendant
Adrienne Smith (1)
Represented By
Marisa L. Serrat
Law Office Of Jaime P. Serrat
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Brenna L. Fasko
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/21/2024 3:56 AM EST
Thursday, December 05, 2024
1 1 Complaint as to Adrienne L. Smith (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 12/5/2024.. (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, December 06, 2024
Arrest of Adrienne L. Smith (1) on 12/6/2024. (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Adrienne L. Smith (1). (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Marisa L. Serrat for Adrienne L. Smith. Counsel must report to the Court any significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 12/6/2024. (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Initial Appearance as to Adrienne L. Smith (1) held on 12/6/2024. Assistant U.S. Attorney Brenna Fasko present as counsel for the United States of America; Attorney Marisa Serrat present and appointed as counsel for defendant; defendant present. Government advised of obligations pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act. Defendant requested a preliminary hearing; government moved for detention; government's motion for detention granted on a temporary basis. Preliminary Examination/Detention Hearing set for 12/11/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter/ECRO: B. Laster. Pretrial: B. Clark. Time: 10 minutes). (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Adrienne L. Smith (1). Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 12/6/2024. (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order as to Adrienne L. Smith (1). Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court reminds the government of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), to disclose evidence favorable to the defendant and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment. The government is ordered to comply with Brady and its progeny. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including dismissal of the indictment or information, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, sanctions by the Court or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 12/6/2024. (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Adrienne L. Smith (1). Preliminary Examination/Detention Hearing set for 12/11/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 12/6/2024. (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/6/2024 in case as to Adrienne L. Smith (1). (H,Ch) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Detention Hearing as to Adrienne L. Smith (1) held on 12/11/2024. Assistant U.S. Attorney Brenna Fasko present as counsel for the United States of America; Attorney Marisa Serrat present as counsel for defendant; defendant present. Defendant waived her right to a preliminary examination; waiver executed. This matter is bound over to the grand jury for further proceedings. Concerning the matter of detention, proffers and arguments were made by the parties. The court took the matter of detention under advisement. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter/ECRO: C. Blair. Pretrial: B. Clark. Time: 50 minutes). (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
9 9 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Adrienne L. Smith (1). (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
IMPORTANT Notice [non-document] as to Adrienne L. Smith (1). Bond Hearing set for 12/12/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. Bond Hearing as to Adrienne L. Smith (1) held on 12/12/2024. Assistant U.S. Attorney Brenna Fasko present as counsel for the United States of America; Attorney Marisa Serrat present as counsel for defendant; defendant present. The court overruled the Government's motion for pretrial detention and set bond at $20,000.00 unsecured with standard and special conditions of release. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal until notified by the clerk or judge that the conditions of release have been satisfied. (Court Reporter/ECRO: C. McCardle. Time: 25 minutes). (D,JJ) [1:24-mj-03243-RJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
13 13 Indictment filed by USA as to Adrienne Smith (1) count(s) 1. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page