Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-02053
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2024 1:38 AM CST
Defendant
Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio (1)
Represented By
Yvonne Marie Gomez
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Material Witness
Mariela Elizabeth Che-Quix
Represented By
Christopher Sully
Law Office Of Chris Sully
contact info
Material Witness
Sulmy Sussely Vasquez-Hernandez
Represented By
Christopher Sully
Law Office Of Chris Sully
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Benjamin Storey Lyles
Doj-Usao
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/21/2024 3:17 AM CST
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
Arrest of Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio, filed. (yi7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
REMARK as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio: MATERIAL WITNESS CASE ASSIGNED TO U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE DREW B. TIPTON. (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio held on 12/4/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Theodore Parran, AUSA; Eva Rocio Fa'Alogo, AFPD. (USPO: Orlando Montemayor) (ERO: Antonio Tijerina) (Interpreter: Adriana Trevino and Woody Lewis, used) (DUSM: Miguel Ruiz). (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker: INITIAL APPEARANCE AND DETENTION HEARING OF MATERIAL WITNESSES Mariela Elizabeth Che-Quix and Sulmy Sussely Vasquez-Hernandez held on 12/4/2024. Material Witnesses placed under oath. Material Witnesses present in the Courtroom. The Court appointed counsel to represent the material witnesses, and counsel, Mr. Christopher Sully, was present for the proceedings. The witnesses verified their true name and country of origin. The Court explained the purpose of the arrest and the nature of the attorney representation. The Government moved for detention. The Court heard from the parties regarding the issue of bond. The Court entered findings that the witnesses were a flight risk and denied bond; a written Order to follow. The Court directed counsel to immediately file motions to take the depositions of the material witnesses to help facilitate their release. Material Witness Hearing set for 12/6/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker. Mr. Sully's presence is not required for the material witness hearing if Motion to Depose Material Witnesses is filed before the material witness hearing. Material Witnesses remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Theodore Parran, AUSA; Christopher Sully, CJA Attorney for Material Witnesses. (ERO: Antonio Tijerina) (DUSM: Miguel Ruiz) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Adriana Trevino/used) (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Yvonne Marie Gomez, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio, filed. (Gomez, Yvonne) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 12/4/2024 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Mariela Elizabeth Che-Quix, Sulmy Sussely Vasquez-Hernandez as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 12/4/2024 at 09:02 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker, filed. (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio, filed. (yi7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness Mariela Elizabeth Che-Quix. Christopher Sully appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness Sulmy Sussely Vasquez-Hernandez. Christopher Sully appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
8 8 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio, filed. [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio. (Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker.) Parties notified. (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Mariela Elizabeth Che-Quix and Sulmy Sussely Vasquez-Hernandez to the custody of the United States Marshal. (Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker.) Parties notified. (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Benjamin Storey Lyles appearing for USA, filed. (Lyles, Benjamin) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
9 9 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio, filed. (sm7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
12 12 Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition of MARIELA ELIZABETH CHE-QUIX by Mariela Elizabeth Che-Quix as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio, filed. (Sully, Christopher) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition of SULMY SUSSELY VASQUEZ-HERNANDEZ by Sulmy Sussely Vasquez-Hernandez as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio, filed. (Sully, Christopher) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 06, 2024
**Terminate Material Witness Hearing set for 12/6/2024 at 11:15 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio. (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER TO DEPOSE MATERIAL WITNESS granting12 Motion to Take Deposition of MARIELA ELIZABETH CHE-QUIX as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio (1). Date: as agreed by the parties, but no later than January 21, 2024, at 10:00 AM. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker.) Parties notified. [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER TO DEPOSE MATERIAL WITNESS granting13 Motion to Take Deposition of SUSSELY VASQUEZ-HERNANDEZ as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio (1). Date: as agreed by the parties, but no later than January 21, 2024, at 10:00 AM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker.) Parties notified. (sas7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
16 16 AMENDED ORDER granting12 and13 Motion to Depose Material Witnesses Mariela Elizabeth Che-Quix and Sulmy Sussely Vasquez-Hernandez in the case of Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio (1). The videotaped depositions will be taken as agreed by the parties, but no later than January 21, 2025. (Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker.) Parties notified. (df7) [7:24-mj-02143]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
17 17 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio (1) count(s) 1-3, filed. (dnr7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
18 18 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Javier Alexander Ruiz-Osorio, filed. (dnr7)
Related: [-]