Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-02023
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2024 1:44 AM CST
Defendant
Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva (1)
Represented By
Eva Rocio Fa'alogo
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Devin Victoria Walker
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/21/2024 3:28 AM CST
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
Arrest of Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva, filed. (kll7) [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Eva Rocio Fa'alogo, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva, filed. (Fa'alogo, Eva) [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Devin Victoria Walker appearing for USA, filed. (Walker, Devin) [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva held on 12/5/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Benjamin Lyles, AUSA; Eva Rocio Fa'Alogo, AFPD. (USPO: Daniel Canchola) (ERO: Omar Orta) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Adriana Trevino, used) (DUSM: Pete De Luna). (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva (1), filed. (Starr) Initial Appearance set for 12/5/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (cb7) (cb7). [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva, filed. (kll7) [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva, filed. [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva, filed. (sm7) [7:24-mj-02155]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva (1) count(s) 1, filed. (sas7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Mario Alberto Jaramillo-Silva, filed. (sas7)
Related: [-]