Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00083
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2024 1:49 AM CST
Defendant
Adrian Jair Escobedo (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
John L Gill
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Rachel Elizabeth Braver
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Material Witness
Junior Eliezer Calix-Vieda
Represented By
Michele R Villarreal-Kuchta
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Holga Suy-Suy
Represented By
Michele R Villarreal-Kuchta
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Hubert Booth
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/21/2024 3:39 AM CST
Friday, December 06, 2024
Arrest of Adrian Jair Escobedo. (jdr2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 07, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Adrian Jair Escobedo (1), filed. (Wharton) Initial Appearance set for 12/9/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock (sdm2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Junior Eliezer Calix-Vieda, Holga Suy-Suy as to Adrian Jair Escobedo. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 12/9/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock, filed. (sdm2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 08, 2024
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (jdr2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Junior Eliezer Calix-Vieda, Holga Suy-Suy. Michele R Villarreal-Kuchta appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (jdr2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rachel Elizabeth Braver, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Adrian Jair Escobedo, filed. (Braver, Rachel) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Junior Eliezer Calix-Vieda as to Adrian Jair Escobedo (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 12/9/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., MW CONDITIONS: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond, 3rd party custodian approved by USPO, residence approved prior to release, not to commit any new crimes and must come to all future hearings., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given., Rights to mandatory consular notification given; case agent to notify consular officials., Material Witness requests the consular officials be notified; AUSA to instruct case agent to make notification. Appearances: Ashley Elizabeth Jurk Martin, AUSA; Michelle Villarreal-Kuchta f/Material Witness; USPO: Alyssa Barrera; USM: Deputy Byars. (Digital # 9:30 - 9:37) (ERO: Martin Solis) (Interpreter: Luz McClellan/used). (jdr2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Holga Suy-Suy as to Adrian Jair Escobedo (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 12/9/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., MW CONDITIONS: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond, 3rd party custodian approved by USPO, residence approved prior to release, not to commit any new crimes and must come to all future hearings., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given., Material Witness requests the consular officials be notified; AUSA to instruct case agent to make notification. Appearances: Ashley Elizabeth Jurk Martin, AUSA; Michelle Villarreal-Kuchta f/Material Witness; USPO: Alyssa Barrera; USM: Deputy Byars. (Digital # 9:30 - 9:37) (ERO: Martin Solis) (Interpreter: Luz McClellan/used). (jdr2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Adrian Jair Escobedo (Defendant informed of rights) held on 12/9/2024. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government moves for an expedited detention hearing based on Defendant's minimal criminal history. Court grants an expedited detention hearing. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 12/10/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock Appearances: Ashley Elizabeth Jurk Martin, AUSA; USPO: Alyssa Barrera; USM: Deputy Byars. (Digital # 9:45-9:51) (ERO: Martin Solis) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (jdr2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Adrian Jair Escobedo. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (jdr2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Adrian Jair Escobedo, filed. (sdm2). [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Adrian Jair Escobedo held on 12/10/2024. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Defendant waives preliminary hearing in open court. Defendant requests to continue detention hearing. Court grants continuance. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: Detention Hearing reset to 12/13/2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Neurock. Appearances: Ashley Elizabeth Jurk Martin, AUSA; Rachel Braver f/Defendant; USPO: Alyssa Barrera; USM: Deputy Byars. (Digital # 10:09-10:10) (ERO: Mara Gonzales) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (jdr2) Modified on 12/12/2024 (asm2). [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE John L Gill, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Adrian Jair Escobedo, filed. (Gill, John) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Patricia Hubert Booth appearing for USA, filed. (Booth, Patricia) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Adrian Jair Escobedo: Detention Hearing set for 12/13/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock (asm2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: DETENTION HEARING as to Adrian Jair Escobedo held on 12/13/2024, the Court relied on factual information from the criminal complaint and the pretrial report. The Court sets the following bond conditions" 1. $30,000 secured bond with a $500 cash deposit. - Third party custodian approved by the U.S. Probation Office. - The defendant's residence must be pre-approved by the U.S. Probation Office. - The defendant cannot reside with any undocumented aliens. 2. The defendant must not violate federal state, or local law while on bond.3. Pretrial Supervision in the Brownsville Division.4. Maintain or actively seek employment. 5. Obtain no passport/ surrender passport.6. Travel restricted to Cameron County, Texas with permission to travel to Corpus Christi for court related matters. Outside travel to be pre-approved by the U.S. Probation Office. No travel outside the U.S. for any reason.7. Avoid all contact with co-defendant, victims, material witnesses or potential victims. 8. Refrain from possessing a firearm, destructive device, or other dangerous weapons. Any firearms, destructive devices or other dangerous weapons in Defendant's approved residence must be removed prior to release. 9. Refrain from the excessive use of alcohol.10. Refrain from use or unlawful possession of a narcotic drug or other controlled substance unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner.11. Submit to any alcohol/drug testing as directed by the U.S. Probation Office. 12. Submit a baseline urinalysis prior to any release on bond. 13. Participate in an electronic monitoring program with GPS and will be at the discretion of U.S. Probation to change. Defendant to pay costs associated with such monitoring based on the ability to pay as determined by the U.S. Probation Office. The electronic monitoring program will include: Curfew. You are restricted to your residence every day from 10:00 pm to 6:00 am or as directed by the U.S. Probation Office. 14. Comply with court obligations in Nueces and Cameron County. 15. Report Contact with Law Enforcement 16. Defendant agrees to attend all scheduled material witness depositions. Defendant agrees and stipulates that failure to attend a scheduled deposition constitutes a knowing waiver of the Defendants right to be present during the deposition and may constitute a waiver of Defendants right to confront and cross-examine the witness(es). 17. Refrain from the possession or consumption of any product containing cannabidiol (CBD). Appearances:AUSA: Young Ming Burkett USPO: Rebecca Cavazos USMS: Deputy Byars. John L Gill.(Digital # 9:48-10:09)(ERO:Jared Marks), filed. (jdr2)[2:24-mj-00577] Modified on 12/20/2024 (jdr2).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Adrian Jair Escobedo, filed. (rm2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Adrian Jair Escobedo. Adrian Jair Escobedo (1) $30,000.00 bond with $500.00 cash deposit ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (ntg2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 Appearance Bond Entered as to Adrian Jair Escobedo in amount of $30,000.00 bond with a $500.00 cash deposit, filed. (ntg2) [2:24-mj-00577]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment,
Att: 2 Affidavit
10 10 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Adrian Jair Escobedo (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, filed. (cga2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
11 11 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Adrian Jair Escobedo, filed. (cga2)
Related: [-]
12 12 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Adrian Jair Escobedo. Arraignment set for 12/27/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton.. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2025 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S. Morales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (cga2)
Related: [-]