Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-03473
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2024 1:45 AM CST
Defendant
Pedro Diaz-Martinez (1)
Represented By
Ricardo E. Calderon
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Holly Diane Pavlinski
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic)
GPO Jan 27 2025
ORDER accepting re 21 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Ernest Gonzalez. (vg)

Docket last updated: 12/21/2024 4:03 AM CST
Monday, November 25, 2024
Arrest of Pedro Diaz-Martinez (drda) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. (drda) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez held on 12/2/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 12/5/2024 9:00AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Ricardo E. Calderon for Pedro Diaz-Martinez appointed. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing by Pedro Diaz-Martinez (mgc) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (mgc) [2:24-mj-03529-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
9 9 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Pedro Diaz-Martinez (bot2)
Related: [-]