Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-03475
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2024 12:15 AM MST
Defendant
Raul Esteban Ramirez Robledo (1)
Represented By
Jeffrey Allen Williams
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Margaret Wu Perlmeter
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/21/2024 1:29 AM MST
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
Arrest of Raul Esteban Ramirez Robledo on 12/18/2024. (RMW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT as to Raul Esteban Ramirez Robledo. (RMW)
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Initial Appearance as to Raul Esteban Ramirez Robledo held on 12/19/2024. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Jeffrey Allen Williams for Defendant with Appointment Type: AFPD. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. The Government is NOT seeking detention, however Pretrial Services recommends location monitoring and requires additional time to screen Defendant's residence. IT IS ORDERED continuing this matter to provide Pretrial Services time to conduct a location screen. Spanish Interpreter required for Defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Raymond Woo on behalf of Margaret Perlmeter for the Government, AFPD Jeffery Williams for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Renata Yawn assists Defendant. Detention Hearing reset for 12/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. Related [+] Hearing held 2:38 PM to 2:43 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Raul Esteban Ramirez Robledo. (KGM)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey.(KGM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]