California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00306
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 20, 2024 11:13 PM PST
Defendant
Thomas Dover (2)
Represented By
E. Marshall Hodgkins, III
Law Offices Of E. Marshall Hodgkins Iii
contact info
Defendant
Henry Torres (1)
Represented By
Melissa B. Baloian
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Arin Heinz
Doj-Usao
contact info
Fresno Forfeiture Unit
United States Attorney'S Office, Fresno
contact info

GPO Dec 11 2024
SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2024 as to Henry Torres, Thomas Dover. (Marrujo, C)[1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
GPO Dec 12 2024
UNSEALING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2024 as to Henry Torres, Thomas Dover. (Marrujo, C)[1:24-mj-00136-SAB] UNSEALING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2024 as to Henry Torres, Thomas Dover. (Marrujo, C)[1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
GPO Dec 23 2024
APPEARANCE and COMPLIANCE BOND ORDER as to Thomas Dover (2). (Xiong, J.)
GPO Dec 23 2024
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS of RELEASE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/23/2024 as to Thomas Dover (2). (Xiong, J.)
GPO Dec 26 2024
DETENTION ORDER as to Henry Torres (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/26/2024. (Valdez, E)

Docket last updated: 02/07/2025 12:58 AM PST
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
1 1 24 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Henry Torres (1), Thomas Dover (2). (Marrujo, C) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs MOTION to Seal by USA as to Henry Torres, Thomas Dover. (Marrujo, C) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2024 as to Henry Torres, Thomas Dover. (Marrujo, C) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 1 pgs MOTION to UNSEAL Complaint by USA as to Henry Torres, Thomas Dover. (Marrujo, C) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs UNSEALING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2024 as to Henry Torres, Thomas Dover. (Marrujo, C) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
8 8 1 pgs ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 12/12/2024 as to Henry Torres. (Marrujo, C) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 12/12/2024 as to Thomas Dover. (Marrujo, C) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
10 10 SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/13/2024: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the Court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Henry Torres is Fully Shackled (USM # 51391-511). (Nguyen, J) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
11 11 SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/13/2024: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the Court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Thomas Dover is Fully Shackled (USM # 51390-511). (Nguyen, J) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
12 12 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: INITIAL APPEARANCE re CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Henry Torres held on 12/13/2024. The defendant consents to appearing by video. The defendant is advised of the charges and rights. The court instructed government counsel under Rule 5(f) to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland. Defendant makes a request to continue matter to retain counsel, Granted. Continued Initial Appearance re Criminal Complaint set for 12/16/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Preliminary Examination is set for 12/27/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Government Counsel: Arin Heinz present. Defense Counsel: Reed Grantham present. Custody Status: In custody - FCJ - fully - present via video. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO: Otilia Rosales. (Nguyen, J) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
13 13 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: INITIAL APPEARANCE re CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Thomas Dover held on 12/13/2024. The defendant consents to appearing by video. The defendant is advised of the charges and rights. The court instructed government counsel under Rule 5(f) to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland. Defendant makes a request to continue matter to retain counsel, Granted. Continued Initial Appearance re Criminal Complaint set for 12/17/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Preliminary Examination is set for 12/27/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Government Counsel: Arin Heinz present. Defense Counsel: Reed Grantham present. Custody Status: In custody - FCJ - fully - present via video. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO: Otilia Rosales. (Nguyen, J) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER (TEXT ONLY) as to Plaintiff USA signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/13/2024: According to the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure Rule 5(f), the government is ordered to comply with its discovery obligations as required by federal law, including those duties imposed by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions interpreting Brady. This order does not relieve any party of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating this order or the government's obligations under Brady may include sanctions, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges, among other consequences. (Nguyen, J) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
15 15 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: CONTINUED INITIAL APPEARANCE re CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Henry Torres held on 12/16/2024. Financial affidavit provided on behalf of the defendant. The Court appoints counsel to represent the defendant in this case. DENIALS ENTERED. Government seeks detention. Defense request for detention hearing to be set. Detention Hearing set for 12/23/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Defendant temporary detained. Preliminary Examination is set for 12/27/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe remains set. Government Counsel: Robert Veneman-Hughes present. Defense Counsel: Melissa Baloian present. Custody Status: In custody - FCJ - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO: Otilia Rosales. (Nguyen, J) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Melissa B. Baloian appearing for Henry Torres. Attorney Baloian, Melissa B. added. (Baloian, Melissa) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
18 18 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: CONTINUED INITIAL APPEARANCE re CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Thomas Dover held on 12/17/2024. Financial affidavit provided on behalf of the defendant. The Court appoints counsel to represent the defendant in this case. DENIALS ENTERED. Government seeks detention. Defense request for detention hearing to be set. Detention Hearing is set for 12/23/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Defendant temporary detained. Preliminary Examination on 12/27/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe remains set. Government Counsel: Arin Heinz present. Defense Counsel: Marshall Hodgkins present. Custody Status: In custody - FCJ - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO: Otilia Rosales. (Nguyen, J) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
19 19 1 pgs CJA 20 APPOINTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/19/2024 adding Melissa B. Baloian for Henry Torres. (Flores, E) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs CJA 20 APPOINTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/19/2024 adding E. Marshall Hodgkins, III for Thomas Dover. (Flores, E) [1:24-mj-00136-SAB]
Related: [-]
21 21 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Henry Torres (1) count(s) 1, 2, Thomas Dover (2) count(s) 3, 4. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs True Bill and Information Sheet