New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-01832
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2024 12:27 AM MST
Defendant
Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas (1)
Represented By
Donald Jeffrey Morrison
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Brenda Richardson
U.S. Probation/pretrial
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Clara Nevarez Cobos
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/21/2024 1:54 AM MST
Friday, October 25, 2024
Arrest of Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas (cfa) [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
Hearing as to Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas: Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2024 at 09:06 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (cfa) [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas. Attorney Clara Nevarez Cobos for USA added. (nr) [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas. (nr) [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Donald Jeffrey Morrison for Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (nr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
3 3 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Initial Appearance as to Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas held on 10/29/2024. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. Appearances: AUSA: Elizabeth Tonkin; AFPD: Joe G Jacinto; FPD Standing In; Interpreter: Enith Valdes-Ortiz. Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 9:42 AM - 9:45 AM. Time In Session: 9:48 AM - 9:52 AM. Courtroom Deputy: Rebecca Helmick. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea for 11/1/2024, at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower), U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (nr) [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
4 4 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (nr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Richardson, Brenda) [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Hearings by Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas (Morrison, Donald) [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
7 7 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. The Court having reviewed the waiver of preliminary hearing, waiver of personal presence at the preliminary hearing and request for tolling of Grand Jury presentment and waiver of detention, now finds that the ends of justice served by granting the request to toll the speedy indictment computation outweigh the interest of the defendant and the public in a speedy indictment. The Court expressly finds that the public's interest in a speedy indictment in this case is outweighed by: (I) the public's interest in a reasonably expeditious resolution of the case; (2) the public's interest in relieving the burden that would be placed on judicial, prosecutorial, defense, and law enforcement resources if the case proceeded to a preliminary examination and/or a speedy indictment; and (3) the potential benefit conferred upon the defendant in an expedited resolution of the case. IT IS THEREFORE. ORDERED, ADJUDGED. and DECREED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(h)(7)(A), a period of time of 75 days from today's date is hereby tolled and excluded from the computation of speedy indictment. At the expiration of this 75-day period, the 30-day period pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(b) for speedy indictment shall resume. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary and detention hearings are vacated.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (nr) [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (vh) [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas: Change of Plea Hearing set for 12/19/2024 at 01:32 PM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. [ Interpreter Needed ](rh) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-01566-JHR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
10 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. The first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judge. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judge's initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (rh)
Related: [-]
11 11 INFORMATION as to Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas (1) count(s) 1. (vh)
Related: [-]
12 12 CONSENT TO PLEA BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas (vh)
Related: [-]
13 13 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas (vh)
Related: [-]
14 14 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas (vh)
Related: [-]
15 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Plea Hearing as to Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas held on 12/19/2024, Plea entered by Juan Alberto Castillo-Lagunas (1) Guilty Count 1. Related [+] (Interpreter: Marcela Renna) (vh)
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Sierra Blanca