Puerto Rico District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-01109
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 21, 2024 3:25 AM AST
Defendant
Nathan Reis (1)
Interested Party
US Probation Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Frank Mario Norris-Agosto
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/21/2024 5:08 AM AST
Thursday, November 21, 2024
Arrest of Nathan Reis (1) in the District of Puerto Rico. (jm)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Nathan Reis (1).(arg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Arrest Warrant
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Nathan Reis (1) held on 11/21/2024. Present: SAUSA Frank Norris, AFPD Samuel Carrion, USPO August Castro. The defendant was present in court, under custody, and did not require the services of a certified court interpreter. The defendant was provided with a redacted copy of the1 indictment received from the Northern District of Texas and was advised as to the charges and as to his rights. The defendant retained counsel for proceedings in the prosecuting district and will retain counsel for the Rule 5 proceedings. The parties were heard as to proposed release conditions. Bail was set at $100,000 secured bond (cash or personal real property, to be posted before 11/27/2024), mental health treatment as deemed appropriate by the USPO, plus standard conditions of release. The defendant shall surrender his passport. Travel is restricted between the District of Puerto Rico and the Northern District of Texas. Travel is restricted to commercial airlines. The defendant shall have no contact with the following potential witnesses: James Flores, Michael Cota, Vivian Arriaga, Eric Karnezis, Anthony Karnezis, Devin Hochberg, Yacine Boraie, and all persons associated with Blueacorn, Capital Plus, and/or Prestamos. The defendant may not liquidate any assets unless in coordination with the USPO. Attorneys fees and household expenses are allowed, with any expense over $10,000 to be notified in advance to the USPO. The defendant may not request new identifications or new forms/lines of credit. An Identity/Removal Hearing is set for 12/3/2024 at 10:30 AM in Hato Rey Courtroom 6 before US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega. (Court Reporter DCR - Hato Rey Courtroom 5.) Hearing held at 10:26 - 10:50. (jm)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Nathan Reis (1) $100,000 secured. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Hector L. Ramos-Vega on 11/21/2024.(arg)
Related: [-]