Member Case
Lead case is: 4:24-bk-90621

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alfredo R Perez
Case #: 4:24-bk-90619
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Party City Corporation
100 Tice Blvd
Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677-8404
Represented By
John F Higgins, IV
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 02/06 11:31 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Belkys Escobar Filed by on behalf of The County Of Loudoun, Virginia (dah4)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 01/15 12:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ernie Zachary Park Filed by on behalf of Franciscan AAH, LLC (mew4)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 01/14 2:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ernie Zachary Park Filed by on behalf of La Habra Associates, LLC (mew4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 01/14 2:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ernie Zachary Park Filed by on behalf of Tustin Market Place I LLC (mew4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
court Notice of Duplicate Case Filing Thu 12/26 1:19 PM
Previous case filed in the Southern District of Texas, Case Number 23-90005 23-90010 (pns4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 25, 2024
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 12/25 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
Monday, December 23, 2024
3 3 court No Creditor Mailing List Mon 12/23 12:25 PM
No Creditor Mailing List (sat4)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 21, 2024
2 2 5 pgs order Joint Administration Sat 12/21 10:25 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 24-90621 Signed on 12/21/2024 (tjl4)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Sat 12/21 12:04 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Party City Corporation. (Higgins, John)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Sat 12/21 12:32 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-90619 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25801491. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Sat 12/21 10:26 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 24-90621 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (tjl4)
Related: [-]