New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christine M Gravelle
Case #: 3:24-bk-22548
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
CCA Construction, Inc.
445 South Street Suite 310
Morristown, NJ 07960
Represented By
Felice R. Yudkin
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Michael D. Sirota
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: Friday May 16, 2025 1:26 AM EDT
Attorney
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
66 Hudson Boulevard
New York, NY 10001
Attorney
Cole Schotz P.C.
Court Plaza North 25 Main Street
Hackensack, NJ 07602
Creditor
BML Properties, Ltd.
Represented By
Brett S. Theisen
Gibbons PC
contact info
Robert Malone
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Kyle McEvilly
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Korcomptenz Inc
Represented By
Courtney Brown
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
Examiner
Todd Harrison
McDermott Will & Emery, LLP One Vanderbilt Avenue
New York, NY, NY 10017
Examiner
Todd Harrison, Examiner
Represented By
Deanna Boll
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CSCEC Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey Cohen
contact info
Andrew Behlmann
Lowenstein Sandler
contact info
Nicole M. Fulfree
Lowenstein Sandler
contact info
Michael A. Kaplan
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Certain Non-Debtor Affiliates of CCA Construction, Inc
Represented By
Shella Borovinskaya
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Plaza Construction Group Florida, LLC
Represented By
Julia E Duffy
Carlton Fields
contact info
Michael T. Hensley
Carlton Fields, P.A.
contact info
Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global
222 N. Pacific Coast Highway Suite 300
El Segundo, CA 90245
Other Prof.
BDO Consulting Group, LLC
Other Prof.
Special Committee of Independent Directors
Represented By
Morris S. Bauer
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Savanna Bierne
Doj-Ust
contact info
Fran B. Steele
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
316 316 misc Withdrawal of Document Fri 05/16 9:38 AM
Withdrawal of Document Related [+] filed by U.S. Trustee. (United States Trustee by Peter J. D'Auria)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Appearance and Request filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee
315 315 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/16 8:55 AM
Order Granting Application To Allow Attorney Nathaniel Allard to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. This order has been mailed to the Treasurer of the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection via US mail. Signed on 5/16/2025. (rms)
Related: [-] 290
314 314 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/16 8:54 AM
Order Granting Application To Allow Attorney Kristin K. Going to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. This order has been mailed to the Treasurer of the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection via US mail. Signed on 5/16/2025. (rms)
Related: [-] 289
313 313 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/16 8:52 AM
Order Granting Application To Allow Attorney Darren Azman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. This order has been mailed to the Treasurer of the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection via US mail. Signed on 5/16/2025. (rms)
Related: [-] 288
312 312 6 pgs motion Seal Fri 05/16 12:09 AM
Motion to Seal re: (i) BML Properties, Ltd.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of the Appointment of Examiner and (ii) the Declaration of Brett S. Theisen, Esq. in Support of BML Properties, Ltd.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of the Appointment of Examiner. Related [+]. Filed by Brett S. Theisen on behalf of BML Properties, Ltd.. Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2025 at 10:00 AM, CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton.. (Theisen, Brett)
Related: [-] [LINK:doc] Sealed Document,[LINK:doc] Sealed Document,309 Document,310 Document
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Motion
Thursday, May 15, 2025
311 311 misc Document Thu 05/15 11:41 PM
Document re: // Examiner's Statement Regarding Proposed Scope of Investigation Related [+] filed by Deanna Boll on behalf of Todd Harrison, Examiner. (Boll, Deanna)
Related: [-] 211 Order on Motion to Appoint Examiner
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Scope Order Provisions
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - May 5 Transcript
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - May 7, 2025 Examiner Letter
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - May 9, 2025 Cole Schotz Letter
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
310 310 misc Document Thu 05/15 11:30 PM
Document re: [Redacted] Declaration of Brett S. Theisen, Esq. in Support of BML Properties, Ltd.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of the Appointment of Examiner Related [+] filed by Brett S. Theisen on behalf of BML Properties, Ltd.. (Theisen, Brett)
Related: [-] 309 Document filed by Creditor BML Properties, Ltd.
309 309 misc Document Thu 05/15 11:28 PM
Document re: [Redacted] BML Properties, Ltd.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of the Appointment of Examiner Related [+] filed by Brett S. Theisen on behalf of BML Properties, Ltd.. (Theisen, Brett)
Related: [-] 88 Motion to Appoint Examiner filed by Creditor BML Properties, Ltd.,120 Objection filed by Debtor CCA Construction, Inc.,211 Order on Motion to Appoint Examiner,296 Order (Generic)
Att: 1 Exhibit A
308 308 answer Objection Thu 05/15 10:45 PM
Objection to Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Exclusive Periods for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Soliciting Acceptance Thereof Related [+] filed by Brett S. Theisen on behalf of BML Properties, Ltd.. (Theisen, Brett)
Related: [-] 265 Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of CCA Construction, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 11:00 AM, CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton.. filed by Debtor CCA Construction, Inc.
Att: 1 Exhibit A
307 307 misc Document Thu 05/15 10:14 PM
Document re: Debtor's Supplemental Brief in Connection with the Scope and Budget of the Authorized Investigation of the Examiner Related [+] filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of CCA Construction, Inc.. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-] 211 Order on Motion to Appoint Examiner
306 306 misc Document Thu 05/15 9:51 PM
Document re: // Declaration of Todd Harrison filed by Deanna Boll on behalf of Todd Harrison, Examiner. (Boll, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
305 305 misc Document Thu 05/15 9:11 PM
Document re: Debtor's Second Supplement Providing Notice of an Additional Professional Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Related [+] filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of CCA Construction, Inc.. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-] 192 Order (Generic)
304 304 claims Certificate of Mailing - Limited User Thu 05/15 7:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 248
303 303 claims Certificate of Mailing - Limited User Thu 05/15 7:11 PM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 301
302 302 misc Master Service List Thu 05/15 3:48 PM
Master Service List filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of CCA Construction, Inc.. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
301 301 misc Certification of No Objection (Chapter 11) Tue 05/13 12:39 PM
Certification of No Objection Related [+] filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of CCA Construction, Inc.. (Sirota, Michael)
Related: [-] 272 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney Cole Schotz P.C.
300 300 claims Certificate of Mailing - Limited User Tue 05/13 12:53 AM
Certificate of Mailing filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC dba Verita Global Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 293 ,291
Friday, May 09, 2025
299 299 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Sat 05/10 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
298 298 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 05/10 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]