New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lee G Dunst
Case #: 2:24-cv-08747
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:39 AM EST
Defendant
Thomas A. Datre
Defendant
Troy J. Datre
Defendant
TD Property Management & Agricultural Inc.
Plaintiff
Luis Penaranda Jaya
Represented By
Victoria Spagnolo
The Nhg Law Group, P.C
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
order Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 5:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold an Initial Conference on 7/8/2025 at 12:00 PM via Zoom. The parties are directed to follow Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rules, which are available on the Court's website, and submit a proposed discovery plan/scheduling order at least five business days prior to the initial conference pursuant to Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rule IV.A.1. The Court will email a Zoom invitation closer to the conference date. This Zoom conference will be a public proceeding; nonparties are welcome to attend via telephone. To receive a telephone invitation, nonparties may contact Judge Dunst's Chambers at (631) 712-5760. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 4/28/2025. (CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Smyth on behalf of Thomas A. Datre, Troy J. Datre, TD Property Management & Agricultural Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Smyth, Jean)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/21 1:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Thomas A. Datre, Troy J. Datre, TD Property Management & Agricultural Inc.. (Campanelli, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/04 4:10 PM
ORDER: On 1/22/2025, the Court granted Defendants' request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint and ordered that any such response be filed by 3/21/2025. On 3/31/2025--over a week after that deadline came and went--Defendants filed a second request for extension of time to respond to the Complaint. The Court strongly disfavors untimely requests for extension, and, indeed, the undersigned's Individual Practice Rules require that such requests "shall be made in writing at least three (3) business days prior to the scheduled appearance or deadline." See Individual Practice Rule II.E.2 (emphasis omitted). Nonetheless, the Court grants the request at DE9 to extend the time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 4/21/2025 . No further extensions shall be granted absent a timely showing of good cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 4/4/2025. (MJG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/31 10:39 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Thomas A. Datre, Troy J. Datre, TD Property Management & Agricultural Inc.. (Smyth, Jean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/22 2:34 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through 3/21/2025 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 1/22/2025. (MJG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/21 2:05 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Stipulation Extending Time to Answer/Move/Respond to Complaint by Luis Penaranda Jaya. (Spagnolo, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/06 11:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Penaranda Jaya. TD Property Management & Agricultural Inc. served on 12/30/2024, answer due 1/20/2025. (Spagnolo, Victoria)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/06 11:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Penaranda Jaya. Troy J. Datre served on 1/4/2025, answer due 1/27/2025. (Spagnolo, Victoria)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/06 11:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Penaranda Jaya. Thomas A. Datre served on 1/4/2025, answer due 1/27/2025. (Spagnolo, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 12/23 1:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Thomas A. Datre, Troy J. Datre, TD Property Management & Agricultural Inc.. (SMF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Mon 12/23 1:19 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SMF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 12/23 1:12 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SMF)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/23 11:32 AM
COMPLAINT against Thomas A. Datre, Troy J. Datre, TD Property Management & Agricultural Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18609407 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - YES,, filed by Luis Penaranda Jaya. (Spagnolo, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/23 1:18 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF)
Related: [-]